EP3675112 - DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Display Co., Ltd. 128, Yeoui-daero, Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL, 07336 / KR | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, HongJae 245, LG-ro Wollong-myeon 10845 Paju-si / KR | 02 /
JUNG, MoonSeok 245, LG-ro Wollong-myeon 10845 Paju-si / KR | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2020/27] | Application number, filing date | 19217472.0 | 18.12.2019 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | KR20180172573 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: KR 20180172573 | [2020/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3675112 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/3266, G09G3/36 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
G09G3/3266 (EP,CN,US);
G09G3/32 (KR);
G09F9/35 (CN);
G09G3/3677 (EP,US);
G02F1/13452 (US);
G02F1/1368 (US);
G09G3/3208 (CN);
G09G3/3674 (CN);
H01L27/124 (US);
H10K59/12 (CN);
G02F1/133357 (US);
G02F1/136222 (US);
G09G2300/0421 (KR);
G09G2300/0426 (EP);
G09G2310/0205 (US);
G09G2310/0267 (KR);
G09G2310/08 (US);
G09G2320/0223 (EP);
G09G2320/0252 (US);
H01L27/1222 (US);
H01L27/1225 (US);
H10K59/131 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] |
Former [2020/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2020/27] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS | [2020/27] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2019 | Examination requested [2020/27] | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014043306 (MIN WOONG KI [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0079] - [0083]; figure 9 *; | [A]US2014168282 (MUN KYEONGSU [KR]) [A] 1* figures 5A,6A *; | [X]US2016225304 (KIM DONG-GYU [KR]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0074] - [0075]; figure 4 *; | [XI]US2017046999 (KIM DONG GYU [KR], et al) [X] 1-9,12-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0052] , [0057] , [0063] - [0065] - [0074] - [0076]; figures 1,2 * [I] 10,11 |