EP3689377 - NOVEL HA BINDING AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visterra, Inc. 275 2nd Avenue Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2020/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHRIVER, Zachary 21 Mount Pleasant Street Winchester, MA 01890 / US | 02 /
VISWANATHAN, Karthik 1 John Swift Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Vidya 275 2nd Avenue 4th Floor Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 04 /
RAGURAM, Sasisekharan 2 Barsky Ct Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | 01 /
SHRIVER, Zachary 21 Mount Pleasant Street Winchester, MA 01890 / US | ||
02 /
VISWANATHAN, Karthik 1 John Swift Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | |||
03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Vidya 2902 Stearns Hill Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | |||
04 /
RAGURAM, Sasisekharan 2 Barsky Ct Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Duffield, Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19217944.8 | 10.05.2013 | [2020/32] | Priority number, date | US201261645554P | 10.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261645554 P | US201261716447P | 19.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261716447 P | US201313830367 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313830367 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3689377 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/42, C07K16/10, A61P31/16 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
C07K16/1018 (EP,US);
C07K16/10 (KR);
A61K39/145 (US);
A61K39/42 (KR,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/56983 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (US);
C07K2317/33 (US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
C07K2317/56 (EP,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE HA BINDEMITTEL | [2020/32] | English: | NOVEL HA BINDING AGENTS | [2020/32] | French: | NOUVEAUX AGENTS DE LIAISON À LA HA | [2020/32] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 04.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13724695.5 / EP2846832 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US4399216 | US4439196 | US4447233 | US4447224 | US4475196 | US4486194 | US4487603 | US4596556 | US4634665 | WO8806882 | US4790824 | US4941880 | US5064413 | US5179017 | US5312335 | US5383851 | US5399163 | US5849992 | US5876721 | WO2004029207 | WO2005047327 | WO2005063815 | WO2008143954 | US2010080813 | US2011201547 | US2011274702 | WO2013011347 | US19530616454 | US19690608378 | US20060837868 | US20070893171 | WO2007US18160 | US20080018783 | US20080969040 | US20080301126 | US20090348266 |