EP3671445 - METHOD FOR STORING DATA IN A VIRTUALISED STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull SAS Rue Jean Jaurès 78340 Les Clayes-sous-Bois / FR | [2020/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONNEL, Thierry River Ouest, 80, Quai Voltaire 95870 Bezons / FR | 02 /
VALLEE, Florence River Ouest, 80, Quai Voltaire 95870 Bezons / FR | 03 /
DEJON, Christian River Ouest, 80, Quai Voltaire 95870 Bezons / FR | 04 /
BLEUZE, Patrice River Ouest, 80, Quai Voltaire 95870 Bezons / FR | [2020/26] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/26] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19218368.9 | 19.12.2019 | [2020/26] | Priority number, date | FR20180073547 | 20.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1873547 | [2020/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3671445 | Date: | 24.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455, G06F9/50, G06F9/54 | [2020/26] | CPC: |
G06F9/54 (EP);
G06F9/455 (EP);
G06F9/5077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] |
Former [2020/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DATENSPEICHERUNG IN EINEM VIRTUELLEN DATENSPEICHERSYSTEM | [2020/26] | English: | METHOD FOR STORING DATA IN A VIRTUALISED STORAGE SYSTEM | [2020/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE DE DONNÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE VIRTUALISÉ | [2020/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 18.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/30] | 18.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3343365 (BULL SAS [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0019] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0038] * * paragraph [0040] * [I] 4,5,9; | [AD]US2016004611 (LAKSHMAN AVINASH [US], et al) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [AD]US9135031 (KNIGHT CLINTON D [US]) [AD] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2016004611 | US9135031 |