EP3838722 - SUBFRAME FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autotech Engineering Deutschland GmbH Gotenstrasse 91 33647 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tahir, Zidane 8 Dryburn Park Durham, DH1 5AD / GB | 02 /
Aso, Raymond 28 Griffiths Court Bowburn, DH6 5FD / GB | 03 /
Richford, Tom 6 Seagrim Crescent Richmond, DL10 4 UB / GB | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19218436.4 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838722 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3838722 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D27/02, B62D21/11, B62D29/00 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
B62D21/11 (EP);
B62D21/00 (CN);
B62D21/03 (US);
B62D27/023 (EP);
B62D29/008 (EP,US);
B62D21/155 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | HILFSRAHMEN FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2021/25] | English: | SUBFRAME FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/25] | French: | FAUX CHÂSSIS POUR UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 19.08.2020 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 19.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2019 | AL | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | CZ | 16.03.2022 | DK | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | ES | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | IT | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | MT | 16.03.2022 | NL | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 20.12.2019 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 20.12.2019 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 20.12.2019 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 16.03.2022 | |
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 16.03.2022 | |
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009020305 (KSM CASTINGS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0041]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102014101979 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0059]; figure 6 *; | [A]DE102014108838 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13* paragraph [0027]; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE102016201815 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0037]; figure 2A * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044]; figures 5A-5C * | by applicant | DE102016201815 |