EP3677410 - THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE IN-SITU MELT PROCESSING METHOD FOR COMPOSITE OVERWRAPPED TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.12.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teijin Carbon America, Inc. 121 Cardiff Valley Road Rockwood, TN 31922 / US | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shpik, Peter 11605 Lanesborough Way Apt. 411 Knoxville, TN Tennessee 37934 / US | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang Dreiköniggasse 10 89073 Ulm / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 19218448.9 | 20.12.2019 | [2020/28] | Priority number, date | US201916240333 | 04.01.2019 Original published format: US201916240333 | [2020/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677410 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3677410 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/32, B29C63/00, F17C1/00, B29B15/12, B29C70/86, B29C70/78, B29C70/38, B29C63/04, B29C70/16, B29C70/34, B32B5/08, B32B7/10, B32B27/04, B32B27/08, B32B27/28, B32B27/32, B32B27/34, D04H3/04, D04H3/12, F17C1/06, F17C1/16 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
B29C70/32 (EP);
B29C70/34 (EP,US);
B29C63/0021 (EP);
B29C70/16 (EP,US);
B29C70/38 (EP,US);
B29C70/682 (US);
B29C70/78 (EP);
B29C70/86 (EP,US);
B29C70/865 (EP,US);
B32B27/04 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
B32B27/285 (EP,US);
B32B27/288 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,US);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B7/10 (EP,US);
D04H3/04 (EP,US);
D04H3/12 (EP,US);
F17C1/06 (EP);
F17C1/16 (EP);
B29B15/122 (EP);
B29C63/04 (EP);
B29K2023/06 (US);
B29K2023/12 (US);
B29K2071/00 (US);
B29K2077/00 (US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0872 (EP,US);
B29K2277/10 (US);
B29K2307/04 (EP,US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
B29L2031/7156 (EP,US);
B32B2250/44 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP,US);
B32B2260/046 (EP,US);
B32B2262/0261 (EP,US);
B32B2262/101 (EP,US);
B32B2262/106 (EP,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,US);
B32B2439/40 (EP,US);
C08J2300/22 (US);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2201/056 (EP);
F17C2203/0604 (EP);
F17C2203/0619 (EP);
F17C2203/066 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | B29C70/32, B29C70/38, B29C70/78, B29C70/86, B29B15/12, F17C1/00, B29C63/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] |
Former [2020/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN MIT IN-SITU-SCHMELZEN VON THERMOPLASTISCHEM VERBUNDSTOFF FÜR MIT VERBUNDSTOFF UMHÜLLTE WERKZEUGE | [2020/28] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITE IN-SITU MELT PROCESSING METHOD FOR COMPOSITE OVERWRAPPED TOOLS | [2020/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE FUSION IN SITU DE COMPOSITE THERMOPLASTIQUE POUR OUTILS ENVELOPPÉS DU COMPOSITE | [2023/48] |
Former [2020/28] | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE FUSION IN SITU DE COMPOSITE THERMOPLASTIQUE POUR APPAREILS ENVELOPPÉS DU COMPOSITE | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 16.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2017079103 (TOHO TENAX AMERICA INC [US]) [XD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0017] , [ 0022] , [ 0024] , [ 0026] , [ 0029] , [ 0030] * * claims 1-11 *; | [XI]US2017361546 (ZHANG MINGFU [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,11,12,14 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0025] , [ 0035] , [ 0057] , [ 0060] , [ 0065] , [ 0066] *[I] 2,5,8,10,13,15 | Examination | US5447586 | by applicant | USH1261H | US6893604 | US2008020193 | US2008201939 | US2014011063 | US2015102037 | WO2017079103 |