EP3673764 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A HAIR REMOVAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB S.A. 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB 69130 Ecully / FR | [2020/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELHOM, Jérémy 11 RUE LEBRUN 69004 LYON / FR | 02 /
HOFLEITNER, Céline 32 rue commandant Fuzier 69003 LYON / FR | [2020/27] | Representative(s) | SEB Développement Direction Propriété industrielle - Brevets 112, chemin du Moulin Carron Campus SEB - CS 90229 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/27] | Bourrières, Patrice SEB Développement SAS Boîte Postale CS 90229 112 Chemin du Moulin Carron 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19218522.1 | 20.12.2019 | [2020/27] | Priority number, date | FR20180074265 | 27.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1874265 | [2020/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3673764 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A45D26/00, B01F7/16, B01F15/06, B01F7/00, B01F13/00 | [2020/27] | CPC: |
A45D26/0014 (EP);
B01F27/90 (CN);
A61K8/60 (CN);
A61K8/9789 (CN);
A61Q9/04 (CN);
B01F27/071 (EP);
B01F27/808 (EP);
B01F27/82 (EP);
B01F33/501 (CN);
B01F33/5014 (EP);
B01F35/2215 (CN);
B01F35/92 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG EINER EPILATIONSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/27] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A HAIR REMOVAL COMPOSITION | [2020/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UNE COMPOSITION ÉPILATOIRE | [2020/27] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/26] | 05.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US9375689 (BRAVO GENESIO [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, line 42 - line 57; figures 3,4,11 * * column 5, line 1 - line 16 *; | [Y]WO02078486 (DES GARETS ANTOINE [FR]) [Y] 2 * column 5, line 25 - column 6, line 18; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO2018089460 (PEPSICO INC [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0174]; figure 16 *; | [A]US5158765 (QASEM PATRICIA A [US]) [A] 11-15 * column 2, line 25 - line 48 * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 33 * | by applicant | FR2777458 | FR2541894 | EP1568294 |