EP3839360 - HEAT PUMP AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Europe N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/32] | For all designated states Daikin Europe N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | ||
For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | |||
Former [2021/25] | For all designated states Daikin Europe N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | ||
For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LIMITED Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delanghe, Eddy c/o DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | 02 /
Coorens, Alain c/o DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | 03 /
Heintz, Nicolas c/o DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | 04 /
Dangreau, Jonas c/o DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | 05 /
de Clerck, Robbe c/o DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | 06 /
Demeyer, Paul c/o DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | 07 /
Coessens, Tim c/o DAIKIN EUROPE N.V. Zandvoordestraat 300 8400 Oostende / BE | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19218593.2 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3839360 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3839360 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/02, F24F13/20, F24F1/029, F24F1/022 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
F24F1/02 (EP);
F24F5/001 (CN);
F24F11/36 (CN,US);
F24F1/00073 (US);
F24F1/0059 (US);
F24F1/022 (EP);
F24F1/029 (EP);
F24F11/89 (CN);
F24F13/00 (CN);
F24F13/20 (EP,US);
F24F13/30 (CN);
F24F5/0096 (CN);
F24F2221/183 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Title | German: | WÄRMEPUMPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR INSTALLATION DERSELBEN | [2021/25] | English: | HEAT PUMP AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING THE SAME | [2021/25] | French: | POMPE À CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/25] | 01.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.07.2024
01.08.2024
ADMISSIBLE ARISTON S.P.A. 45, Viale Aristide Merloni 60044 Fabriano (AN) / IT Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2024/36] | 16.08.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.11.2023 | CZ | 01.11.2023 | DK | 01.11.2023 | EE | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | LT | 01.11.2023 | LV | 01.11.2023 | MC | 01.11.2023 | NL | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SE | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | LU | 20.12.2023 | BG | 01.02.2024 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | PT | 01.03.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SK | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
CZ | 01.11.2023 | ||
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
EE | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
DK | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
LV | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SE | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 01.11.2023 | |
LT | 01.11.2023 | ||
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
PT | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 01.11.2023 | |
NL | 01.11.2023 | ||
BG | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]AU459154B ; | [YD]EP3139105 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [XI]FR3070755 (BERNIER DEV [FR]) | by applicant | FR2827948 | EP3139105 | EP3222941 | Opposition | EP0726430 | DE102009029392 | JP2016217567 | WO2017090104 | US2019170604 | JP2019184090 | DE102019101427 |