EP3838281 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BACTERIAL STRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4D Pharma Research Limited Life Sciences Innovation Building Cornhill Road Aberdeen, Aberdeenshire AB25 2ZS / GB | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Brand Murray Fuller LLP 50 Eastcastle Street London W1W 8EA / GB | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19219112.0 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838281 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61K9/00, A61K9/19, A61P25/00, A61P25/18, A61P25/24, A61P25/28 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP);
A61K35/742 (EP,KR);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P25/18 (EP,KR);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT BAKTERIENSTÄMMEN | [2021/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING BACTERIAL STRAINS | [2021/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES SOUCHES BACTÉRIENNES | [2021/25] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 09.07.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2014121304 (SERES HEALTH INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0077] , [0110] , [0120]; example 4; claim 31; table 1; sequences 637, 886,1591, *; | [X]WO2017091783 (SERES THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * page 26, line 15 - line 30; claims 1-20; sequences 59-63 * * page 29, line 6 - line 9 *; | [X]WO2017182796 (GENOME RES LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * claims 4, 66, 80-82, 91, 101, 102; sequence 3 *; | [X]WO2019032572 (FINCH THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * page 63, line 17 - line 20; claim 1; table 5 * * claims 55, 63; sequences 31, 622, 905, 2277, 2425, 2436 *; | [A] - J.-P. CARLIER ET AL, "Proposal to unify Clostridium orbiscindens Winter et al. 1991 and Eubacterium plautii (Seguin 1928) Hofstad and Aasjord 1982, with description of Flavonifractor plautii gen. nov., comb. nov., and reassignment of Bacteroides capillosus to Pseudoflavonifractor capillosus gen. nov., comb. nov.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SYSTEMATIC AND EVOLUTIONARY MICROBIOLOGY, GB, (20100301), vol. 60, no. 3, doi:10.1099/ijs.0.016725-0, ISSN 1466-5026, pages 585 - 590, XP055709216 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 588, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/ijs.0.016725-0 | [A] - GOKBEN HIZLI SAYAR ET AL, "Psychobiotics: The Potential Therapeutic Promise of Microbes in Psychiatry", KLINIK PSIKOFARMAKOLOJI BULTENI // BULLETIN OF CLINICAL PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, TR, (20160601), vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.5455/bcp.20160531111208, ISSN 1017-7833, pages 93 - 102, XP055463551 [A] 1-15 * Autism spectrum disorders * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.5455/bcp.20160531111208 | by applicant | WO03046580 | WO2013008039 | WO2013050792 | WO2014167338 | US2016067188 | - SPOR et al., Nat Rev Microbiol., (20110000), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 279 - 90 | - ECKBURG et al., Science, (20050000), vol. 308, no. 5728, pages 1635 - 8 | - MACPHERSON et al., Microbes Infect., (20010000), vol. 3, no. 12, pages 1021 - 35 | - MACPHERSON et al., Cell Mol Life Sci., (20020000), vol. 59, no. 12, pages 2088 - 96 | - MAZMANIAN et al., Cell, (20050000), vol. 122, no. 1, pages 107 - 18 | - FRANK et al., PNAS, (20070000), vol. 104, no. 34, pages 13780 - 5 | - SCANLAN et al., J Clin Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 44, no. 11, pages 3980 - 8 | - KANG et al., Inflamm Bowel Dis., (20100000), vol. 16, no. 12, pages 2034 - 42 | - MACHIELS et al., Gut, (20130000), vol. 63, no. 8, pages 1275 - 83 | - MAYER et al., The Journal of Neuroscience, (20140000), vol. 34, no. 46, pages 15490 - 15496 | - CRYANDINAN, Neuropsychopharmacology, (20150000), vol. 40, pages 241 - 2 | - ZHOUFOSTER, Neuropsychiatric Disease and Treatment, (20150000), vol. 11, pages 715 - 723 | - DE THEIJE et al., Brain Behav Immun., (20140000), vol. 37, pages 197 - 206 | - GOLDINGORBACH, Clin Infect Dis., (20080000), vol. 46, no. 2, pages 96 - 100 | - AZAD et al., BMJ, (20130000), vol. 347, page f6471 | - BRAVO et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 16050 - 5 | - KANTAK et al., Behav Pharmacol., (20140000), vol. 25, pages 71 - 9 | - SAVIGNAC et al., Neurogastroenterol Motil., (20140000), vol. 26, pages 1615 - 27 | - HSIAO et al., Cell, (20130000), vol. 155, pages 1451 - 63 | - DIIRRE, Microbiol Spectr., (20140800), vol. 2, no. 4 | - CHUN et al., Int J Syst Evol Microbiol, (20070000), vol. 57, pages 2259 - 2261 | - MASCO et al., Systematic and Applied Microbiology, (20030000), vol. 26, pages 557 - 563 | - SRUTKOVA et al., J. Microbiol. Methods, (20110000), vol. 87, no. 1, pages 10 - 6 | - WANG et al., J Neurogastroenterol Motil, (20160000), vol. 22, pages 589 - 605 | - MULLER et al., Neuroscience, (20160000), vol. 321, pages 131 - 139 | - TADANO et al., Methods Find Exp Clin Pharmacol, (20040000), vol. 26, pages 93 - 7 | - ANDERO et al., Prog Mol Biol Transl Sci., (20140000), vol. 122, pages 169 - 92 | - PHILIPS et al., Neuron, (19910000), vol. 7, pages 695 - 702 | - NG et al., Int J Mol Sci., (20190000), vol. 20, page E257 | - FERRER et al., Brain Res., (20000000), vol. 866, pages 257 - 61 | - DELAVILLE et al., Front Syst Neurosci., (20110000), vol. 5, page 31 | - ZHOU, Drugs Future, (20040000), vol. 29, pages 1235 - 1244 | - MIYAMOTO-SHINOHARA et al., J. Gen. Appl. Microbiol., (20080000), vol. 54, pages 9 - 24 | - LESLIE et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (19950000), vol. 61, pages 3592 - 3597 | - MITROPOULOU et al., J Nutr Metab., (20130000), vol. 716861 | - KAILASAPATHY et al., Curr Issues Intest Microbiol., (20020000), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 39 - 48 | - STROBEL, Methods Mol Biol., (20090000), vol. 581, pages 247 - 61 | - Handbook of Experimental Immunology, Blackwell Scientific Publications, (19860000), vol. I-IV | - SMITHWATERMAN, Adv. Appl. Math., (19810000), vol. 2, pages 482 - 489 |