Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
06.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
27.01.2022 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.12.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.11.2021 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
21.05.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
23.12.2019 | Change - representative |