Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023020844 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19219125 | 20.12.2019 | WO2020IB62225 | 18.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4077500 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19219125 | 20.12.2019 | WO2020IB62225 | 18.12.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114981345B | Global Dossier | 12.03.2024 | B | CN114981345 | 30.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | EP19219125 | 20.12.2019 | WO2020IB62225 | 18.12.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021124278 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19219125 | 20.12.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3838973 | Global Dossier | 23.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP19219125 | 20.12.2019 |