EP3838973 - METHODS FOR FORMING A POLYMER BEAD FOAM INCLUDING A NANOSTRUCTURED FLUOROPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHPP Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2021/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOOSSENS, Johannes Gerardus Petrus SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen Op Zoom / NL | 02 /
RAMAKRISHNAN, Vaidyanath SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen Op Zoom / NL | 03 /
GOOSSENS, Johannes Martinus Dina SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen Op Zoom / NL | [2021/25] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/25] | Application number, filing date | 19219125.2 | 20.12.2019 | [2021/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3838973 | Date: | 23.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/00, C08J9/18, C08J9/228 | [2021/25] | CPC: |
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
B29C44/3446 (US);
B29C44/3453 (EP);
B29C44/3461 (EP,US);
C08J9/0038 (EP);
C08J9/18 (EP,US);
C08J9/228 (EP,US);
B29K2027/18 (US);
B29K2067/003 (US);
B29K2079/085 (US);
C08J2205/044 (EP);
C08J2367/03 (US);
C08J2367/04 (EP);
C08J2379/08 (EP,US);
C08J2423/28 (EP);
C08J2427/12 (EP);
C08J2427/18 (EP,US);
C08J2467/04 (EP);
C08J2479/08 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FORMUNG EINES POLYMERKÜGELCHENSCHAUMS MIT EINEM NANOSTRUKTURIERTEN FLUORPOLYMER | [2021/25] | English: | METHODS FOR FORMING A POLYMER BEAD FOAM INCLUDING A NANOSTRUCTURED FLUOROPOLYMER | [2021/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE FORMATION DE MOUSSE DE BILLES DE POLYMÈRE COMPRENANT UN FLUOROPOLYMÈRE NANOSTRUCTURÉ | [2021/25] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/23] | 26.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2017179212 (JSP CORP) [X] 1-5,7,9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] - [0 39] - [0042] - [0 62] - [0068] - [0 71] - [0072] - [0 77] * * figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,8,10,13,15; | [A]CN109251412 (UNIV HUNAN TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-15* example 3 *; | [Y]US2019338098 (RAMAKRISHNAN VAIDYANATH [NL], et al) [Y] 6,8,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0 29] - [0030] - [0 33] , [0 45] , [0 64] , [0 65] , [0 75] - [0077] * | by applicant | US4154775 | US5314925 | US5804654 | US6040370 | WO2018122747 | EP20180214797 |