EP3750720 - VEHICLE WHEEL FOR PASSENGER CARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxion Wheels Holding GmbH Ladestraße 53639 Königswinter / DE | [2021/49] |
Former [2020/51] | For all designated states Maxion Wheels Holding GmbH Ladestraße 1 53639 Königswinter / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kermelk, Werner Derscheid 37 53804 Much / DE | 02 /
Rode, Karl Berghausener Str. 188 53639 Königswinter / DE | 03 /
Stelzer, Günter Alte Str. 8b 53604 Bad Honnef / DE | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 50672 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/51] | Althaus, Arndt Patentanwälte Buschhoff Hennicke Althaus Kaiser-Wilhelm-Ring 24 50672 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 19219365.4 | 04.11.2013 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | DE201220104260U | 06.11.2012 Original published format: DE 202012104260 U | [2020/51] | Previously filed application, date | WO2013IB59879 | 04.11.2013 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750720 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3750720 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60B3/00, B60B3/10 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
B60B3/004 (EP,EA,US);
B60B3/04 (EA,US);
B60B1/10 (EA,US);
B60B3/007 (EP,EA,US);
B60B3/008 (EP,EA,US);
B60B3/10 (EP,EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGRAD FÜR PERSONENKRAFTWAGEN | [2020/51] | English: | VEHICLE WHEEL FOR PASSENGER CARS | [2020/51] | French: | ROUE DE VÉHICULE POUR VOITURES | [2020/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13795300.6 / EP2917045 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.2024
15.04.2024
ADMISSIBLE Accuride Wheels Solingen GmbH Weyerstr. 112-114 42697 Solingen / DE Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/21] | 26.04.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.08.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | MC | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
MC | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 12.07.2023 | |
ES | 12.07.2023 | ||
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SK | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2011193404 (KIHARA YUJI [JP], et al); | [XAYI]EP2495110 (MW ITALIA S P A [IT]) | by applicant | EP1262333 | US7104611 | EP1790499 | Opposition | WO02090132 | EP1348578 | WO2004024469 | EP1782965 | DE102005019457 | WO2007101574 | DE112010001192T | DE112009002533T | EP2495110 | DE112009002429T | EP2628611 |