EP3686145 - REMOTELY MAINTAINING THE CONNECTION STATUS OF A CONNECTION PORT OF A PASSENGER CARRYING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITCZAK, Tadeusz Pawel 5 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT Connecticut 06032 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 19219507.1 | 23.12.2019 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | US201916258934 | 28.01.2019 Original published format: US201916258934 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686145 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
B66B5/0025 (EP);
H04L67/025 (CN);
B66B1/3453 (US);
B66B5/0087 (EP,US);
H04L67/125 (CN);
H04W4/021 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FERNWARTUNG DES VERBINDUNGSSTATUS EINES ANSCHLUSSPORTS EINES PASSAGIERBEFÖRDERUNGSSYSTEMS | [2020/31] | English: | REMOTELY MAINTAINING THE CONNECTION STATUS OF A CONNECTION PORT OF A PASSENGER CARRYING SYSTEM | [2020/31] | French: | MAINTENANCE À DISTANCE DE L'ÉTAT DE CONNEXION D'UN PORT DE CONNEXION D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DE PASSAGERS | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 29.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5064026 (NAGATA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 9; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]WO2012154170 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [00011] - paragraph [00016]; figures 1, 2 *; | [XAI]JP2016052933 (TOSHIBA ELEVATOR CO LTD) [X] 1,3,9-14 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * [A] 8 [I] 2,4-7,15; | [A]WO2017050785 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * page 7, line 21 - line 34; figures 1-6 * |