EP3685807 - APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF PULLING A TENSILE MEMBER FROM A MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cordis US Corp. 14201 Northwest 60th Avenue Miami Lakes, FL 33014 / US | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states Cardinal Health Switzerland 515 GmbH Lindenstrasse 10 6340 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RINCON, Cesar 33 Union Sq Apt 212 Union City, CA 94587-3535 / US | 02 /
KREVER, Matthew 15 Shepard Way Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 / US | 03 /
OLSEN, Daniel 215 Beacon Hill Road Califon, NJ 07830 / US | 04 /
JOHNSON, Edward P.O. Box 368 Skaneateles, NY 13152 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/31] | Prock, Thomas Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19219548.5 | 22.06.2011 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | US201035819710P | 24.06.2010 Original published format: US 35819710 P | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3685807 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/95 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
A61F2/95 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2/9517 (EP,CN,US);
A61F2002/9511 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] |
Former [2020/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR RETRAKTION EINES ZUGELEMENTS AUS EINER MEDIZINISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/31] | English: | APPARATUS FOR AND METHOD OF PULLING A TENSILE MEMBER FROM A MEDICAL DEVICE | [2020/31] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TIRER UN ÉLÉMENT DE TRACTION À PARTIR D'UN DISPOSITIF MÉDICAL | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 29.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/11] | 26.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11728748.2 / EP2585004 | EP17173586.3 / EP3231401 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19838414 (JOMED IMPLANTATE GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2002077634 (LEONHARDT HOWARD J [US], et al); | [A]EP1440673 (MEDTRONIC VASCULAR INC [US]); | [X]US2005080476 (GUNDERSON RICHARD C [US], et al); | [XI]WO2007044929 (GORE ENTERPRISE HOLDINGS INC [US], et al); | [A]EP1834610 (MEDTRONIC VASCULAR INC [US]); | [X]WO2008034793 (ANGIOMED AG [DE], et al) | by applicant | US2009264992 | US2009270967 | US20090489738 | US20100358197 |