EP3843320 - PUBLIC/PRIVATE KEY SYSTEM WITH INCREASED SECURITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garcia Morchon, Oscar c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Gorissen, Paulus Mathias Hubertus Mechtildis@Antonius c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Tolhuizen, Ludovicus Marinus Gerardus Maria c/o Philips International B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/26] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/26] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 19219637.6 | 24.12.2019 | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843320 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, H04L9/30 | [2021/26] | CPC: |
H04L9/0841 (EP,US);
H04L9/3093 (EP,US);
H04L9/14 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/06] |
Former [2021/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÖFFENTLICHES/PRIVATES SCHLÜSSELSYSTEM MIT ERHÖHTER SICHERHEIT | [2021/26] | English: | PUBLIC/PRIVATE KEY SYSTEM WITH INCREASED SECURITY | [2021/26] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CLÉ PUBLIQUE/PRIVÉE À SÉCURITÉ AMÉLIORÉE | [2021/26] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/06] | 03.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.01.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3402118 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0028] *; | [A]WO2019076706 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2019312728 (POEPPELMANN THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-15* claims 1-20 * | by applicant | - "An Efficient Key Mismatch Attack on the NIST Second Round Candidate Kyber", YUE QINCHI CHENG, Member, IEEE | EP20160197277 |