EP3845305 - CLOSURE PLATE FOR PRELOADING A PLATE REACTOR, PLATE REACTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petróleos de Portugal-Petrogal, SA Rua Tomás Fonseca, Torre C 1600-209 Lisboa / PT | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONDE CORREIA DOS SANTOS, Joaquim António Rua Domingos Machado, 215-225 4250-201 Porto / PT | 02 /
BRITO LOPES, José Carlos Rua Dr. Pedro Dias, 47 - 3ºEsq 4200-441 Porto / PT | 03 /
GOMES DE ALMEIDA, Fernando Rua São Tomé e Principe, 402, 3º Esquerdo Posterior 4430-228 Vila Nova De Gaia / PT | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Patentree Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19220292.7 | 31.12.2019 | [2021/27] | Priority number, date | PT20190066441 | 30.12.2019 Original published format: PT 2019066441 | [2021/27] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3845305 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/24, F28F9/02 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
B01J19/249 (EP,US);
B01J19/0073 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2453 (US);
B01J2219/2486 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSPLATTE ZUM VORSPANNEN EINES PLATTENREAKTORS, PLATTENREAKTOR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/27] | English: | CLOSURE PLATE FOR PRELOADING A PLATE REACTOR, PLATE REACTOR AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2021/27] | French: | PLAQUE DE FERMETURE POUR PRÉCHARGER UN RÉACTEUR À PLAQUE, RÉACTEUR À PLAQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/27] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/24] | 28.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2402697 (CIPRIANI LUCA [IT]) [Y] 1,5,6,8-13,15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0069] ** paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] *; | [XAY]WO2013182427 (ALFA LAVAL CORP AB [SE]) [X] 1,5,6,8-13,15 * page 1, line 1 - line 20 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 2 * * page 11, line 15 - line 30; figure 5 * * page 12, line 17 - line 20; figure 3 * * page 13, line 22 - line 25 * * page 22, line 1 - line 7 * [A] 2-4,7,14 [Y] 1,5,6,8-13,15 |