Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] |
21.09.2021 | Change - representative | |
08.09.2021 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.09.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.08.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
20.08.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
20.08.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] |
15.01.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
17.09.2019 | Change - representative |