EP3777695 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GUIDING THE ACQUISITION OF ULTRASOUND DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allain, Pascal c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
De Craene, Mathieu c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Denis, Eric c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Langet, Helene c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
Pizaine, Guillaume Julien Josep c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 06 /
Popoff, Alexandre c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 07 /
Van De Star, Sietze c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 08 /
Talgorn, Elise Claude Valentine c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 09 /
Villain, Nicolas François c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 10 /
Gauriau, Romane Isabelle Marie-Bernard c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 11 /
Piro, Paolo High Tech Campus Building 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 12 /
Visweswara, Ashoka Sathanur c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 13 /
Saloux, Eric Michel Gerard Jean Pierre c/o PhilipsInternational B.V. - Intellectual Property & Standards - HTC 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | de Haan, Poul Erik Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 19290070.2 | 13.08.2019 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777695 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/00, A61B8/08 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A61B8/4254 (EP);
A61B8/4263 (EP);
A61B8/46 (EP);
A61B8/5292 (EP);
A61B8/06 (EP);
A61B8/085 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FÜHRUNG DER ERFASSUNG VON ULTRASCHALLDATEN | [2021/07] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR GUIDING THE ACQUISITION OF ULTRASOUND DATA | [2021/07] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR GUIDER L'ACQUISITION DE DONNÉES ULTRASONORES | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 17.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 07.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2022/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004019270 (TAKEUCHI TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,10,12-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0070] * [I] 3,6,7,9,11; | [I]EP1525850 (ALOKA CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]JP2010201049 (ALOKA CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]US2014081142 (TOMA TADAMASA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5997479 | US6013032 | US6283919 | US6443896 | US6458083 | US6530885 | US6623432 |