blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3770301

EP3770301 - METHOD FOR CHEMICAL POLISH FOR METAL PIECES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.12.2021
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.12.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.01.2022  [2022/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ARKEMA FRANCE
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
[2021/04]
Inventor(s)01 / YASUDA, Maho
KYOTO (ARKEMA) - TECHNICAL CENTER
SCB No3, Kyoto Research Park
93 Awatacho Chudoji
SHIMOGYO-KU
KYOTO, 600-8815 / JP
 [2021/04]
Representative(s)Arkema Patent
Arkema France
DRD-DPI
51, Esplanade du Général de Gaulle
CS 10478
92907 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2021/04]Arkema Patent
Arkema France
DRD-DPI
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date19305966.422.07.2019
[2021/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3770301
Date:27.01.2021
Language:EN
[2021/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.01.2020
ClassificationIPC:C23F3/02, B29C45/00, C25D11/24, C25D11/04, C25D11/16, C25D11/18, C23F3/04
[2021/04]
CPC:
C23F3/02 (EP,CN,KR); C23F3/04 (EP,CN,KR); C23G1/14 (US);
B29C45/14311 (EP,KR); C23F13/005 (US); C25D11/08 (EP,CN,KR);
C25D11/16 (EP,KR); C25D11/24 (EP,KR); C25D11/246 (EP,KR);
C25D11/34 (CN); B29K2077/00 (EP,KR); B29K2705/00 (EP,KR);
C23F2213/30 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/04]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM CHEMISCHEN POLIEREN VON METALLTEILEN[2021/04]
English:METHOD FOR CHEMICAL POLISH FOR METAL PIECES[2021/04]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE POLISSAGE CHIMIQUE DE PIÈCES MÉTALLIQUES[2021/04]
Examination procedure28.07.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2022/01]
17.08.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2022/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[YD]JP2000054166  (DENKA HIMAKU KOGYO KK);
 [YA]CN104607884B  ;
 [Y]US2017081774  (LAI FENG-JU [TW]);
 [YA]CN108015491  (ZHONGXIANG CHANGFU PRECISION ELECTRONIC TECH CO LTD)
by applicantJPH02298284
 JP2000054166
 JP2001200374
 US8394503
 US9683304
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.