EP3826038 - ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EnerSys Delaware Inc. 2366 Bernville Road Reading, PA 19605 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRELIVET, Damien 3 Rue Jean Bodel Batiment B 62000 Arras / FR | 02 /
ROUDAUT, Maxime 103 bis Avenue Fernand Lobbedez App 11 bat A 62000 Arras / FR | 03 /
DEHEM, Patrick 24 bis Rue Renault 62490 Vitry en Artois / FR | 04 /
GORI, Paul Antoine Appt 6 - 4, Rue du Saumon 62000 Arras / FR | 05 /
LETOMBE, David 169 Avenue JF Kennedy 62000 Arras / FR | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/21] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19306491.2 | 20.11.2019 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3826038 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/34, H02J50/70, H02J50/10, // B60L53/12 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
B60L53/122 (EP);
H01F27/2847 (US);
H01F27/2866 (EP);
H01F27/303 (EP);
H01F27/306 (US);
H01F30/06 (US);
H01F30/10 (EP);
H02J50/10 (EP);
H02J50/70 (EP);
H02J50/005 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP);
Y02T90/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] |
Former [2021/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER TRANSFORMATOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN TRANSFORMATORS | [2021/21] | English: | ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRICAL TRANSFORMER | [2021/21] | French: | TRANSFORMATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN TRANSFORMATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 24.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0715392 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [IY]US2004174241 (HE JIN [US], et al); | [Y]US2018082777 (VANDEPLASSCHE PHILIPPE [BE], et al) |