EP3667267 - HYBRID SENSING APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERCEL 16, Rue de Bel Air 44470 Carquefou / FR | [2020/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALISHIN, Oleg c/o SERCEL 16, Rue de Bel Air 44470 CARQUEFOU / FR | 02 /
GUICHARD, Florent c/o SERCEL 16, Rue de Bel Air 44470 CARQUEFOU / FR | 03 /
NICOLAS, Frédéric c/o SERCEL 16, Rue de Bel Air 44470 CARQUEFOU / FR | 04 /
VISSEAUX, Clément c/o SERCEL 16, Rue de Bel Air 44470 CARQUEFOU / FR | [2020/25] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2020/25] | Application number, filing date | 19306627.1 | 11.12.2019 | [2020/25] | Priority number, date | US201816217396 | 12.12.2018 Original published format: US201816217396 | [2020/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3667267 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01H9/00, E21B47/12, G01V1/22, G01V8/00, G01V11/00 | [2020/25] | CPC: |
G01V11/00 (EP);
E21B47/135 (US);
E21B47/07 (US);
E21B47/114 (EP);
G01H9/004 (EP);
G01V1/181 (US);
G01V1/189 (US);
G01V1/226 (EP,US);
G01V1/24 (US);
G01V1/42 (US);
G01V1/44 (US);
G01V1/52 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/02] |
Former [2020/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DRAHTLOSEN ERFASSUNG | [2020/25] | English: | HYBRID SENSING APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2020/25] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION HYBRIDES | [2020/25] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/02] | 09.12.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004216872 (FOSTER MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 2,9,10 *; | [A]US2014138528 (POPE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1,3,15 * figure 9 *; | [YD]US9523790 (VALISHIN OLEG [FR]) [YD] 1-15 * column 3, line 65 - column 5, line 63 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 9 * * claim 10 * * figures 1-3, 8 *; | [A]US2017363830 (PARK BRIAN VANDELLYN [US], et al) [A] 14* paragraphs [0011] , [0 18] , [0 19] * | by applicant | US2012046866 | US9523790 |