EP3745070 - HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLY THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OVH 2, rue Kellermann 59100 Roubaix / FR | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEHADE, Ali 26 TER Rue de Wachemy 59242 Templeuve / FR | 02 /
BAUCHART, Grégory Francis Louis 5 sentier des Hauts Jardins d'Eté 59150 Wattrelos / FR | 03 /
KLABA, Henryk 3 avenue Brame 59170 Croix / FR | 04 /
LEFÈVRE, François-Eudes Jean Lucien 25b Route de Saint Genouph 37520 La Riche / FR | [2021/31] |
Former [2020/49] | 01 /
Chehade, Ali 26 TER Rue de Wachemy 59242 Templeuve / FR | ||
02 /
Bauchart, Grégory Francis Louis 5 sentier des Hauts Jardins d'Eté 59150 Wattrelos / FR | |||
03 /
Klaba, Henryk 3 avenue Brame 59170 Croix / FR | |||
04 /
Lefevre, François-Eudes Jean Lucien 25b Route de Saint Genouph 37520 La Riche / FR | Representative(s) | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 17-21, rue Saint-Fiacre 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | BCF Global Centre d'Entreprise et d'Innovation 56, Bd Niels Bohr CS 52132 69603 Villeurbanne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19315039.8 | 29.05.2019 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3745070 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3745070 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F28D3/02, F28D1/04, F28D1/02, F28F9/013, F24F13/30 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
F28D3/02 (EP);
H05K7/20209 (CN);
F28F9/0075 (US);
F24F13/30 (EP);
F28D1/024 (EP);
F28D1/0426 (EP);
F28D1/0443 (US);
F28F9/013 (EP);
F28F9/266 (US);
H05K7/20172 (CN);
H05K7/202 (CN);
H05K7/20281 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHERANORDNUNG UND MONTAGEVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2020/49] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLY THEREOF | [2020/49] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE | [2020/49] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 21.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2019 | AL | 04.08.2021 | AT | 04.08.2021 | CY | 04.08.2021 | CZ | 04.08.2021 | EE | 04.08.2021 | ES | 04.08.2021 | FI | 04.08.2021 | HR | 04.08.2021 | IT | 04.08.2021 | LT | 04.08.2021 | LV | 04.08.2021 | MC | 04.08.2021 | MK | 04.08.2021 | RO | 04.08.2021 | RS | 04.08.2021 | SE | 04.08.2021 | SK | 04.08.2021 | SM | 04.08.2021 | BG | 04.11.2021 | NO | 04.11.2021 | GR | 05.11.2021 | IS | 04.12.2021 | PT | 06.12.2021 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
MK | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CY | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
MC | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
IT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 04.08.2021 | |
AT | 04.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
SM | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
CZ | 04.08.2021 | ||
EE | 04.08.2021 | ||
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RO | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
SK | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
HR | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
LV | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
GR | 05.11.2021 | ||
IS | 04.12.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
RS | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
PT | 06.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
ES | 04.08.2021 | ||
FI | 04.08.2021 | ||
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
SE | 04.08.2021 | ||
BG | 04.11.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 04.08.2021 | |
LT | 04.08.2021 | ||
NO | 04.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1698847 (HIPPOCRATES DAMBASSINAS [GR], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009014983 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009077225 (HEAT ALLIED HEAT EXCHANGE TECH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 25, line 22 - page 26, line 13; figure 7 *; | [A]US2014099086 (MERCER KEVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]EP3306247 (LUVE SPA [IT]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |