EP3546034 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CHILDREN'S GAME STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumalim, S.L. Ctra. Urroz, s/n° 31398 Tiebas-Navarra / ES | [2019/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERRA CASTILLO, José Miguel SUMALIM, S.L. Ctra. Urroz, s/nº 31398 TIEBAS-NAVARRA / ES | 02 /
GUERRA VILLANUEVA, Mikel SUMALIM, S.L. Ctra. Urroz, s/nº 31398 TIEBAS-NAVARRA / ES | 03 /
MINDEGUIA PETRIRENA, Ion SUMALIM, S.L. Ctra. Urroz, s/nº 31398 TIEBAS-NAVARRA / ES | [2019/40] | Representative(s) | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria, et al IPAMARK, S.L. C/ Segre 27- 1° 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | Urizar Anasagasti, Jesus Maria, et al IPAMARK, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 72 1° 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 19382213.7 | 27.03.2019 | [2019/40] | Priority number, date | ES20180030296 | 27.03.2018 Original published format: ES 201830296 | [2019/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3546034 | Date: | 02.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/24, A63G31/00, A63G33/00, A63B9/00, A63B24/00, A63F13/21, A63F13/24, A63F13/25 | [2019/40] | CPC: |
A63F13/21 (EP);
A63B71/0619 (EP);
A63B71/0622 (EP);
A63F13/24 (EP);
A63F13/25 (EP);
A63F9/24 (EP);
A63G31/00 (EP);
A63G33/00 (EP);
A63B17/02 (EP);
A63B2071/0694 (EP);
A63B2220/802 (EP);
A63B2220/803 (EP);
A63B2220/805 (EP);
A63B2225/20 (EP);
A63F2009/2442 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG FÜR KINDERSPIELSTRUKTUREN | [2019/40] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE FOR CHILDREN'S GAME STRUCTURES | [2019/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR STRUCTURES DE JEU D'ENFANTS | [2019/40] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 24.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2009095283 (KOMPAN AS [DK], et al) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * columns 1-9 * * columns 14-17 * * claims 1-19 *; | [I]WO2006040404 (LAPPSET GROUP OY [FI], et al) [I] 1-7 * abstract * * columns 1-2 * * columns 4-7 * * claims 1-14 * | by applicant | EP1732048 | WO2008148002 | US2016136529 |