EP3581381 - CUTTING MACHINE FOR CUTTING SHEETS OF CARDBOARD, PAPER OR THE LIKE AND DIGITAL PRINTING LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comercial Industrial Maquinaria Carton Ondulado, S. L. Avda. Conde Llobregat 48 Martorell 08760 Barcelona / ES | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SERRA OBIOL, Ramon Av. Conde De Llobregat, 48 08760 Martorell / ES | 02 /
PUIG VARGAS, Jordi Av. Conde De Llobregat, 48 08760 Martorell / ES | [2019/51] | Representative(s) | Isern-Jara, Nuria Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 19382406.7 | 21.05.2019 | [2019/51] | Priority number, date | ES20180030908U | 14.06.2018 Original published format: ES 201830908 U | [2019/51] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581381 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/58, B41F19/00, B41J3/44, B26D1/00, B26D7/00 | [2019/51] | CPC: |
B41F13/58 (EP);
B26D1/151 (EP,US);
B26D7/015 (US);
B26D7/018 (EP,US);
B26D7/0625 (EP,US);
B26D7/2635 (US);
B26D7/32 (US);
B41F19/008 (EP);
B41J11/68 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/24] |
Former [2019/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNEIDMASCHINE ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON BÖGEN AUS KARTON, PAPIER ODER DERGLEICHEN UND DIGITALDRUCKSTRASSE | [2019/51] | English: | CUTTING MACHINE FOR CUTTING SHEETS OF CARDBOARD, PAPER OR THE LIKE AND DIGITAL PRINTING LINE | [2019/51] | French: | MACHINE DE DÉCOUPE DE FEUILLES DE CARTON, DE PAPIER OU SIMILAIRE ET LIGNE D'IMPRESSION NUMÉRIQUE | [2019/51] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/24] | 29.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/48] | 27.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE102013214607 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1,13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0027] - [0029] - [0047] * [Y] 6,7 [I] 2-5,8-12,14; | [I]US2008092705 (IMKAMP THOMAS [DE], et al) [I] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0020] *; | [Y]EP3064327 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [Y] 6,7 * figures 3a,3b * * paragraph [0028] * |