EP3769850 - PLUG FOR A LIQUID-PRODUCT DISPENSING CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Open Innovation 2 Go, SL Calle Guipúzcoa 30 28223 Pozuelo de Alarcón (Madrid) / ES | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Longarte Cifrián, Ignacio Guipuzcoa 30 28223 Madrid / ES | 02 /
De Pablos, David Guipuzcoa 30 28223 Madrid / ES | 03 /
Abad de Aranzábal, Guillermo Guipuzcoa 30 28223 Madrid / ES | 04 /
Baturone Moreno de Carlos, Pablo Guipuzcoa 30 28223 Madrid / ES | 05 /
Gómez Fuente, Oscar Guipuzcoa 30 28223 Madrid / ES | 06 /
Alcalá Galán, Francisco Guipuzcoa 30 28223 Madrid / ES | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. Avda. Diagonal, 463 Bis, 2° 08036 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | Isern Patentes y Marcas S.L. C/Príncipe de Vergara 43, 6 planta 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 19382619.5 | 22.07.2019 | [2021/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3769850 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00, H02N2/18 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
H02N2/18 (EP);
B05C5/0225 (US);
B05B11/108 (EP);
H02N2/181 (US);
H02N2/183 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOPFEN FÜR EINEN FLÜSSIGKEITSPRODUKTAUSGABEBEHÄLTER | [2021/04] | English: | PLUG FOR A LIQUID-PRODUCT DISPENSING CONTAINER | [2021/04] | French: | BOUCHON POUR RÉCIPIENT DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUITS LIQUIDES | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 12.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.09.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP2662008 (GOTOHTI COM INC [CA]) [X] 1-6,8,10,12-15 * figures 18,21,19,20,15,3,12,13; examples 300,701,18,46,48,200,261,260 * [A] 7,9,11; | [A]US9027788 (OPHARDT HEINER [CH], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 13,22,8,9; examples 120,16,44,47 *; | [A]DE102014212525 (JOHNSON MATTHEY CATALYSTS GERMANY GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* columns 6,8,12, paragraphs 8,33,47; figures 1,2a,2b; examples 14,8,26,22 * |