EP3828529 - SMOKE DETECTOR FOR ASPIRATION SMOKE DETECTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | [2021/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUREL, Ricard Burriel Castillejos, 285, 6-1 08025 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
BARCELÓ, Iñigo Barrera Rubidi, 17, 3-1 08906 Hospitalet de Lloregat / ES | [2021/22] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/22] | Application number, filing date | 19383052.8 | 27.11.2019 | [2021/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3828529 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/02, G01N21/53, G01J1/42, G01N15/00, G01J3/44, G01J3/02, G01J3/32, G01J3/10, G01N1/22, G01N1/26, G08B17/107 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
G01N21/53 (EP);
G01N15/06 (US);
G01J3/0216 (EP);
G01J3/10 (EP);
G01J3/32 (EP);
G01J3/4412 (EP);
G01N1/2273 (EP);
G01N1/26 (EP);
G01N15/0211 (EP);
G08B17/107 (EP);
G01J2001/4242 (EP);
G01N15/075 (US);
G01N2015/0046 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/42] | G01N21/53, G08B17/107, G01N15/02, G01N1/26, G01N1/22, G01J3/10, G01J3/32, G01J3/02, G01J3/44, G01N15/00, G01J1/42 | ||
Former IPC [2021/22] | G01N21/53, G01J3/02, G01N1/22, G01N1/26, G01N15/14, G08B17/103 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] |
Former [2021/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHDETEKTOR FÜR ANSAUGRAUCHMELDERSYSTEM | [2021/22] | English: | SMOKE DETECTOR FOR ASPIRATION SMOKE DETECTOR SYSTEM | [2021/22] | French: | DÉTECTEUR DE FUMÉE POUR SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTEUR DE FUMÉE D'ASPIRATION | [2021/22] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 02.12.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 21.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004057050 (BECK TYLER J [US], et al); | [XI]US2019145883 (BURRIEL RICARD [ES], et al); | [XI]US2019287364 (BIRNKRANT MICHAEL J [US], et al) |