EP3772235 - CONTROL SYSTEM INTEGRATED WITH A SOLAR LIGHTING FICTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.11.2022 [2022/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMSI Ewa Sekula ul. Mieczyslawa Wolfkego 8/41 01-494 Warszawa / PL | [2021/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekula, Ewa ul.Mieczyslawa Wolfkego 8/41 01-494 Warszawa / PL | [2021/05] | Representative(s) | Chodanionek, Andrzej Ul. Wiolinowa 3/3 02-785 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/05] | Korbela, Anna ul. Kilinskiego 30 lok. 2 42-202 Czestochowa / PL | Application number, filing date | 19460038.3 | 29.07.2019 | [2021/05] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3772235 | Date: | 03.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05B45/12, H05B47/13, F21S8/08 | [2021/05] | CPC: |
H05B45/12 (EP);
F21S8/088 (EP);
H05B47/13 (EP);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] |
Former [2021/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT EINER SOLARLEUCHTE INTEGRIERTES STEUERUNGSSYSTEM | [2021/05] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM INTEGRATED WITH A SOLAR LIGHTING FICTURE | [2021/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE INTÉGRÉ À UN APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE SOLAIRE | [2021/05] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 02.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/46] | 12.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2012064906 (INOVUS SOLAR INC [US], et al) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] - [0079] - [0151] - [0221] , [0381]; figures 1-3,7,12,37,55,57,59 *; | [I]EP2962035 (DIAMOND PETER JAMES ANDREW [GB]) [I] 1-5 * paragraphs [0010] - [0027]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | PL216114 | PL411855 | CN104421755 | CN109185812 |