EP3708545 - METHOD FOR GRANULATING GLASS BATCH COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 14.08.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klisch spolka z ograniczona odpowiedzialnoscia ul. Kardynaia Stefana Wyszynskiego 57D 38-400 Krosno / PL | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLISCH, Marian ul. Kardynala Stefana Wyszynskiego 57D 38-400 Krosno / PL | [2024/21] |
Former [2020/38] | 01 /
Klisch, Marian ul. Kardynala Stefana Wyszynskiego 57D 38-400 Krosno / PL | Representative(s) | AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o. ul. Rondo Ignacego Daszynskiego 1 00-843 Warsaw / PL | [2024/23] |
Former [2020/38] | AOMB Polska Sp. z.o.o. Ul. Emilii Plater 53 21st Floor 00-113 Warsaw / PL | Application number, filing date | 19461517.5 | 11.03.2019 | [2020/38] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3708545 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3708545 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03B1/02, C03C1/02, C03C3/097 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
C03B1/02 (EP);
C03C1/026 (EP);
C03C3/097 (EP);
Y02P40/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2020/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM GRANULIEREN VON GLASGEMENGEBESTANDTEILEN | [2020/38] | English: | METHOD FOR GRANULATING GLASS BATCH COMPONENTS | [2020/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GRANULATION DE COMPOSANTS D'UN LOT DE VERRE | [2020/38] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 12.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5393714 (THOMETZEK PETER [IT], et al); | [X]EP3127876 (FERRO CORP [US]) | by applicant | US2077258 | US3206528 | US3266886 | US3767751 | US3804651 | US3914364 | US4026691 | US4028131 | US4031175 | US4235618 | US4243423 | US6518212 | EP2944618 | EP3095765 |