EP3786976 - DATA PROCESSING IN A SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC POSTUROGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Politechnika Lodzka ul. Zeromskiego 116 90-924 Lodz / PL | For all designated states Uniwersytet Medyczny w Lodzi al. Kosciuszki 4 90-419 Lodz / PL | For all designated states Instytut Medycyny Pracy im. prof. dr med. Jerzego Nofera w Lodzi ul. Sw. Teresy od Dzieciatka Jezus 8 91-348 Lodz / PL | For all designated states Labo Clinic Sp. z o.o. ul. Dworcowa 41a/2 10-437 Olsztyn / PL | For all designated states Platinum Seed Incubator Sp. z o.o. ul. Wladyslawa Broniewskiego 4 lok. 42 87-100 Torun / PL | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TYLMAN, Wojciech ul. Leszczynskiej 20/4 93-347 Lodz / PL | 02 /
KOTAS, Rafal ul. Osiedle Dolnoslaskie 333/139 97-400 Beichatow / PL | 03 /
MARCINIAK, Pawel ul. Sacharowa 27/7 92-524 Lodz / PL | 04 /
KAMINSKI, Marek ul. Odynca 30/4 93-150 Lodz / PL | 05 /
SAKOWICZ, Bartosz ul. Boguslawskiego 28 93-534 Lodz / PL | 06 /
SZERMER, Michal ul. Roszkowskiego 2 93-352 Lodz / PL | 07 /
JANC, Magdalena ul. Komandorska 1 m. 8 94-116 Lodz / PL | 08 /
ZAMYSLOWSKA-SZMYTKE, Ewa ul. Barbary 4a 91-502 Lodz / PL | 09 /
JOZEFOWICZ-KORCZYNSKA, Magdalena ul. Stocka 5/7 m. 3 93-191 Lodz / PL | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Kancelaria Eupatent.pl Sp. z.o.o Ul. Kilinskiego 185 90-348 Lodz / PL | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19461575.3 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786976 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G16H40/67, G16H50/20 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G16H40/67 (EP);
A61B5/1122 (EP);
G16H50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DATENVERARBEITUNG IN EINEM SYSTEM ZUR DYNAMISCHEN POSTUROGRAFIE | [2021/09] | English: | DATA PROCESSING IN A SYSTEM FOR DYNAMIC POSTUROGRAPHY | [2021/09] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES DANS UN SYSTÈME DE POSTUROGRAPHIE DYNAMIQUE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 04.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/07] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US10258259 (ZETS GARY [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * column 9, line 58 - column 15, line 9 *; | [A]WO2010150260 (MEDICAL RES INFRASTRUCTURE & HEALTH SERVICES FUND TEL AVIV MEDICAL CT [IL], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 17, line 15 - page 19, line 13 * | by applicant | US2014081177 |