EP3809089 - A HEADER TANK ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Autosystemy SP. Z.O.O. Przemyslowa 3 32-050 Skawina / PL | [2021/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODZINA, Radoslaw C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32 050 SKAWINA / PL | 02 /
BARUS, Lukasz C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32 050 SKAWINA / PL | 03 /
NAWROCKI, Mateusz C/o Valeo Autosystemy Sp. z o.o. UL. PRZEMYSLOWA 3 32-050 SKAWINA / PL | [2021/16] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle ZA l'Agiot, 8 rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil-Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | Bialkowski, Adam Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Industrial Property Department ZA L'Agiot 8 rue Louis Lormand, CS 80517 LA VERRIERE 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 19461589.4 | 18.10.2019 | [2021/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3809089 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02 | [2021/16] | CPC: |
F28F9/0226 (EP,US);
F28D7/16 (CN);
F28F9/06 (CN);
F28F9/165 (US);
F28F2275/122 (US);
F28F2275/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERER WASSERKASTENANORDNUNG | [2021/16] | English: | A HEADER TANK ASSEMBLY | [2021/16] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE RÉSERVOIR COLLECTEUR | [2021/16] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/21] | 12.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2005283 (S.A. DES USINE CHAUSSON, ASNIERES, HAUTS-DE-SEINE) [X] 1* figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE3833262 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]) [X] 1,6,10 * columns 3-5; figures 1-4 *; | [X]DE29704913U (AUTOKUEHLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,6,10 * pages 4-6; figures 2-3 *; | [XA]US5979546 (STOLARSKI DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1,6,10 * columns 2-3; figures 1-10 * [A] 2-5,7-9 |