EP3755245 - ACETABULAR REAMER HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/01] | ACETABULAR REAMER HANDLE AND METHOD OF REAMING AN ACETABULUM | ||
[2024/03] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Ireland Unlimited Company Loughbeg Industrial Estate Ringaskiddy County Cork / IE | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLATTERS, Ian C/o DePuy International Limited St. Anthony's Road Leeds, West Yorkshire LS11 8DT / GB | 02 /
HORNE, David C/o DePuy International Limited St. Anthony's Road Leeds, West Yorkshire LS11 8DT / GB | 03 /
TEMPLE, Duncan C/o DePuy International Limited St. Anthony's Road Leeds, West Yorkshire LS11 8DT / GB | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/21] |
Former [2021/01] | Burton, Nick Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19700286.8 | 10.01.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019EP50571 | Priority number, date | GB20180002787 | 21.02.2018 Original published format: GB 201802787 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019161986 | Date: | 29.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3755245 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3755245 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61B17/1666 (EP,US);
A61B17/1631 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGRIFF FÜR HÜFTGELENKPFANNEN-FRÄSER | [2024/03] | English: | ACETABULAR REAMER HANDLE | [2024/03] | French: | MANCHE D'ALÉSOIR ACÉTABULAIRE | [2024/03] |
Former [2021/01] | HANDGRIFF FÜR HÜFTGELENKPFANNEN-REAMER UND REAMING-VERFAHREN FÜR HÜFTGELENKPFANNE | ||
Former [2021/01] | ACETABULAR REAMER HANDLE AND METHOD OF REAMING AN ACETABULUM | ||
Former [2021/01] | MANCHE D'ALÉSOIR ACÉTABULAIRE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ALÉSAGE D'UN ACÉTABULUM | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 13.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2012109229 (FORSELL PETER [CH]) [X] 1,18,20,23* figures 36,39-41,47 * |