Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3741186 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3741186



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(64)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 498
27.01.2025 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
27.01.2025 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.01.2025 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.01.2025 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.01.2025 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 33
27.01.2025 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 33
10.11.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.11.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
10.11.2023 Claims Search / examination 3
10.11.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.11.2023 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
31.07.2023 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.07.2023 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.04.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.04.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
19.04.2022 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 10
19.04.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
19.04.2022 Description Search / examination 2
19.04.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.04.2022 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.12.2021 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
09.12.2021 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.12.2021 Examination started Search / examination 1
03.09.2021 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
27.08.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.08.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 47
27.08.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 4
27.08.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.08.2021 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Search / examination 1
24.06.2021 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.06.2021 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 47
04.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.06.2021 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 1
19.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.02.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
19.02.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
19.02.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
19.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.10.2020 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.08.2020 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
24.08.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.08.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.08.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
24.08.2020 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.08.2020 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 9
17.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.07.2020 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.05.2020 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
22.04.2020 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
22.04.2020 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
12.08.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 50
25.07.2019 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
25.07.2019 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 48
22.01.2019 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 6
16.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 1
16.01.2019 Incoming letter related to PCT RO PCT receiving Office 1
15.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
15.01.2019 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
15.01.2019 Claims PCT receiving Office 8
15.01.2019 Description PCT receiving Office 31
15.01.2019 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 2
15.01.2019 Drawings PCT receiving Office 7
15.01.2019 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 5
15.01.2019 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 49