EP3742931 - PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR A DRAWER AND METHOD FOR ALIGNING A DRAWER ON A PULL-OUT GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG Vahrenkampstraße 12-16 32278 Kirchlengern / DE | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERTES, Rolf Farnweg 32 32107 Bad Salzuflen / DE | 02 /
KRÜGER, David Albert-Rusch-Str. 42 32545 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2020/49] | Application number, filing date | 19700664.6 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019EP50560 | Priority number, date | DE201810101342 | 22.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018101342 | [2020/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019141583 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742931 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3742931 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/956, A47B88/427 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
A47B88/427 (EP);
A47B88/956 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/49] | A47B88/427 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSZIEHFÜHRUNG FÜR EINEN SCHUBKASTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUSRICHTEN EINES SCHUBKASTENS AN EINER AUSZIEHFÜHRUNG | [2020/49] | English: | PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR A DRAWER AND METHOD FOR ALIGNING A DRAWER ON A PULL-OUT GUIDE | [2020/49] | French: | GLISSIÈRE DE GUIDAGE POUR UN TIROIR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ALIGNER UN TIROIR À UNE GLISSIÈRE DE GUIDAGE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 11.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.03.2022 | CZ | 23.03.2022 | DK | 23.03.2022 | EE | 23.03.2022 | FI | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | LT | 23.03.2022 | LV | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | NL | 23.03.2022 | PL | 23.03.2022 | RO | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SE | 23.03.2022 | SI | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | NO | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | PT | 25.07.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.03.2022 | |
NO | 23.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XDA]DE102015106789 (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XD] 9,12,14,15 * paragraph [0023] * * figures 3,6A-6C * [A] 1-8,10,11,13; | [IA]WO2017194466 (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [I] 9 * figures 1-7 *[A] 1-8,10-15; | [XA]TWI605777B (KING SLIDE WORKS CO LTD [TW], et al) [X] 14,15 * figures 6-10 * [A] 1-13 | by applicant | DE102015106789 |