EP3911850 - SWITCHABLE MECHANICAL MOTOR VEHICLE COOLANT PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.10.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg Pump Technology GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Str. 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2021/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINIDORI, Laurent c/o Pierburg Pump Technology France S.á.r.l. Z.l. de Thionville, Nord-Est BP 10149 - Basse Ham 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | 02 /
SIMON, Gilles c/o Pierburg Pump Technology France S.á.r.l. Z.l. de Thionville, Nord-Est BP 10149 - Basse Ham 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | 03 /
SQUARCINI, Dr. Raffaele c/o Pierburg Pump Technology Italy SpA Orlando Salvatore 10 57123 Livorno / IT | 04 /
DATTOLI, Emmanuel c/o Pierburg Pump Technology France S.á.r.l. Z.l. de Thionville, Nord-Est BP 10149 - Basse Ham 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | 05 /
BRUANT, Sebastien c/o Pierburg Pump Technology France S.á.r.l. Z.l. de Thionville, Nord-Est BP 10149 - Basse Ham 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | 06 /
RYBICKI, Gilles c/o Pierburg Pump Technology France S.á.r.l. Z.l. de Thionville, Nord-Est BP 10149 - Basse Ham 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | 07 /
PERONI, Giorgio c/o Pierburg Pump Technology Italy SpA Orlando Salvatore 10 57123 Livorno / IT | 08 /
DIPACE, Antonio c/o Pierburg Pump Technology GmbH Alfred-Pierburg- Straße 1 41460 Neuss / DE | 09 /
KREMER, Jerome c/o Pierbug Pump Technology France S.á.r.l. Z.l. de Thionville, Nord-Est BP 10149 - Basse Ham 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | 01 /
FINIDORI, Laurent 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | ||
02 /
SIMON, Gilles 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | |||
03 /
SQUARCINI, Dr. Raffaele 57123 Livorno / IT | |||
04 /
DATTOLI, Emmanuel 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | |||
05 /
BRUANT, Sebastien 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | |||
06 /
RYBICKI, Gilles 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | |||
07 /
PERONI, Giorgio 57123 Livorno / IT | |||
08 /
DIPACE, Antonio 41460 Neuss / DE | |||
09 /
KREMER, Jerome 57974 Yutz Cédex / FR | Representative(s) | terpatent PartGmbB Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | terpatent Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Daubert Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19700712.3 | 15.01.2019 | [2021/47] | WO2019EP50958 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020147936 | Date: | 23.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3911850 | Date: | 24.11.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16, F04D15/00, F04D29/18 | [2021/47] | CPC: |
F01P7/161 (EP);
F01P7/14 (US);
F01P5/12 (US);
F04D1/00 (EP);
F04D15/0038 (EP,US);
F04D29/188 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/47] | Title | German: | SCHALTBARE MECHANISCHE KÜHLMITTELPUMPE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2021/47] | English: | SWITCHABLE MECHANICAL MOTOR VEHICLE COOLANT PUMP | [2021/47] | French: | POMPE À LIQUIDE DE REFROIDISSEMENT DE VÉHICULE À MOTEUR MÉCANIQUE COMMUTABLE | [2021/47] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/47] | 28.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]US2018320692 (ZIELBERG STEPHAN [DE], et al) [XD] 1-4,9 * paragraphs [0016] , [0018] , [0019] , [0034] , [0035] , [0036]; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-8; | [A]DE102014009367 (GERÄTE UND PUMPENBAU GMBH DR EUGEN SCHMIDT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0028]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE102013018205 (GERÄTE UND PUMPENBAU GMBH DR EUGEN SCHMIDT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0025] - [0032] - [0 39] - [0042]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19906130 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 2-9 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2017076645 |