EP3744103 - EFFICIENT SUB-PICTURE EXTRACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | [2024/13] |
Former [2022/16] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastr. 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/49] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKUPIN, Robert Naugarder Straße 42 10409 Berlin / DE | 02 /
HELLGE, Cornelius Erich-Weinert-Straße 5 10439 Berlin / DE | 03 /
GEORGE, Valeri John-Sieg-Straße 24 10365 Berlin / DE | 04 /
SCHIERL, Thomas Boris-Pasternak-Weg 7b 13156 Berlin / DE | 05 /
SÁNCHEZ DE LA FUENTE, Yago Warschauer Strasse 67 10243 Berlin / DE | 06 /
SÜHRING, Karsten Schreinerstraße 64a 10247 Berlin / DE | 07 /
WIEGAND, Thomas Otto-Appel-Str. 52 14195 Berlin / DE | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/13] |
Former [2020/49] | Schenk, Markus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19700743.8 | 21.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019EP51394 | Priority number, date | EP20180153516 | 25.01.2018 Original published format: EP 18153516 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145262 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3744103 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3744103 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, H04N19/17, H04N19/119, H04N19/176, H04N19/48 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
H04N19/17 (EP);
H04N19/119 (EP,KR,US);
H04L65/70 (US);
H04L65/75 (US);
H04L65/756 (EP,KR);
H04N19/174 (KR,US);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/188 (KR);
H04N19/46 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE UNTERBILDEXTRAKTION | [2020/49] | English: | EFFICIENT SUB-PICTURE EXTRACTION | [2020/49] | French: | EXTRACTION DE SOUS-IMAGE EFFICACE | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 02.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24158671.8 / EP4351138 | Request for further processing for: | 28.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 28.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NL | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
SE | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 |