EP3737583 - VEHICLE SEAT HAVING AN ELECTRIC HEATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKTSCHEFFEL, Jörg Bergfeld 23 38162 Cremlingen / DE | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Löbbecke, Carsten Volkswagen AG Brieffach 1770 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [2020/47] | Application number, filing date | 19700770.1 | 08.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019EP50269 | Priority number, date | DE201810200293 | 10.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018200293 | [2020/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019137877 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737583 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3737583 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/56, B60N2/58, B60N2/70, H05B3/34 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B60N2/58 (EP);
B60N2/5685 (EP,US);
B60N2/70 (EP);
H05B3/34 (EP,US);
H05K9/0081 (US);
H05B2203/029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGSITZ MIT EINER ELEKTRISCHEN HEIZEINRICHTUNG | [2020/47] | English: | VEHICLE SEAT HAVING AN ELECTRIC HEATING DEVICE | [2020/47] | French: | SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE COMPRENANT UN ÉQUIPEMENT DE CHAUFFAGE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 10.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008206553 (SCHNEIDER NORBERT [DE], et al) [Y] 2,4-7 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] , [0 28] , [0 40] , [0 41] , [0 83] , [0 89] , [0 96] , [0 97] , [0 98] , [0 99] , [ 102] , [ 103] *; | [XY]WO2009049577 (WET AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0 11] , [0 12] , [0 13] , [0 16] , [0 17] , [0 18] , [0 50] , [0 51] * [Y] 2,4-7 | by applicant | DE102009003867 | DE102013100792 | EP2352974 | DE112015001591T |