EP3746987 - METHOD FOR REPRESENTING AN ENVIRONMENTAL REGION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH VIRTUAL, ELONGATED DISTANCE MARKERS IN AN IMAGE, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AS WELL AS DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Connaught Electronics Ltd. Dunmore Road Tuam, County Galway / IE | [2024/32] |
Former [2020/50] | For all designated states Connaught Electronics Ltd. Dunmore Road Tuam, County Galway / IE | ||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Huanqing Connaught Electronics Ltd. Dunmore Road Tuam, Co Galway / IE | 02 /
O'MALLEY, Fergal Connaught Electronics Ltd. Dunmore Road Tuam, Co Galway / IE | 03 /
BAUER, Guenter Gartenstr. 51 85238 Petershausen / DE | 04 /
RUHL, Felix Schleißheimerstraße 19 80333 München / DE | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 19701157.0 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019EP50583 | Priority number, date | DE201810102047 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: DE102018102047 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019149497 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746987 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3746987 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/04, G06T3/40, G06T19/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
G06T15/04 (EP,KR);
G06T15/205 (KR,US);
G06T19/00 (EP,KR,US);
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G06T3/4038 (EP,KR);
G06T2207/30208 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG EINES UMGEBUNGSBEREICHS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS MIT VIRTUELLEN, LÄNGLICHEN ABSTANDSMARKIERUNGEN IN EINEM BILD, COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT SOWIE ANZEIGESYSTEM | [2020/50] | English: | METHOD FOR REPRESENTING AN ENVIRONMENTAL REGION OF A MOTOR VEHICLE WITH VIRTUAL, ELONGATED DISTANCE MARKERS IN AN IMAGE, COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT AS WELL AS DISPLAY SYSTEM | [2020/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REPRÉSENTATION D'UNE RÉGION ENVIRONNEMENTALE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE AVEC DES MARQUEURS DE DISTANCE VIRTUELS ET ALLONGÉS DANS UNE IMAGE, PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR ET SYSTÈME D'AFFICHAGE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 22.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2011032357 | DE102013013364 |