EP3609716 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRINTED PLASTISOL LAYER OR PAINT LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLBRICH GmbH Teutonenstrasse 2-10 46395 Bocholt / DE | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOSTEN, Andre Käthe-Kollwitz-Straße 26 46399 Bocholt / DE | 02 /
ROBELING, Dirk Mosse 22 46395 Bocholt / DE | 03 /
TE WELSCHER, Frans Am Lönsstadion 3 46397 Bocholt / DE | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/08] | Angerhausen, Christoph Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19701193.5 | 17.01.2019 | [2020/08] | WO2019EP51147 | Priority number, date | DE201810110522 | 02.05.2018 Original published format: DE102018110522 | [2020/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019211008 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609716 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609716 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00, B41M7/00 | [2020/08] | CPC: |
B41M7/009 (EP,US);
B41M5/0011 (EP);
B41M5/0047 (EP);
B41M5/0064 (EP);
B41M7/0027 (US);
B41M7/0081 (EP);
B41M5/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BEDRUCKTEN PLASTISOL- ODER LACKSCHICHT | [2020/08] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PRINTED PLASTISOL LAYER OR PAINT LAYER | [2020/08] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FABRICATION D'UNE COUCHE DE PLASTISOL OU DE VERNI IMPRIMÉE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 12.11.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24158905.0 / EP4397500 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007231525 (BODWELL JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]WO2008061930 (CIBA HOLDING INC [CH], et al); | [XY]US2016297223 (LANGENSCHEIDT ANDREAS [DE], et al) |