EP3749950 - METHOD FOR IN-SITU MONITORING OF THE QUALITY OF GAS DELIVERED TO A CONSUMING INDUSTRIAL SITE USING THE THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY TECHNIQUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/51] | METHOD FOR ON-SITE TESTING OF THE QUALITY OF GASES DELIVERED TO A INDUSTRIAL CONSUMER SITE, USING A THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY TECHNIQUE | ||
[2022/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Carbagas Hofgut 3073 Gümligen / CH | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEYER, Heinz C/O CARBAGAS Hofgut 3073 Gümligen / CH | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Air Liquide L'Air Liquide S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 19701395.6 | 30.01.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019EP52286 | Priority number, date | EP20180305119 | 06.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18305119 | [2020/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154697 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749950 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3749950 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G01N25/18, G01N33/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
G01N25/18 (EP,US);
G01N33/0006 (EP,US);
G06Q10/083 (US);
G06Q30/0185 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTROLLMETHODE VOR ORT DER QUALITÄT VON GASEN, DIE AN EINEN DIESE VERBRAUCHENDEN INDUSTRIESTANDORT GELIEFERT WERDEN, MITHILFE VON WÄRMELEITFÄHIGKEIT | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD FOR IN-SITU MONITORING OF THE QUALITY OF GAS DELIVERED TO A CONSUMING INDUSTRIAL SITE USING THE THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY TECHNIQUE | [2022/36] | French: | MÉTHODE DE CONTRÔLE SUR SITE DE LA QUALITÉ DES GAZ LIVRÉS SUR UN SITE INDUSTRIEL CONSOMMATEUR UTILISANT LA TECHNIQUE DE LA CONDUCTIVITÉ THERMIQUE | [2020/51] |
Former [2020/51] | VERFAHREN ZUR VOR-ORT-PRÜFUNG DER QUALITÄT DER EINEM INDUSTRIELLEN VERBRAUCHERSTANDORT ZUGEFÜHRTEN GASE UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER WÄRMELEITUNGSTECHNIK | ||
Former [2020/51] | METHOD FOR ON-SITE TESTING OF THE QUALITY OF GASES DELIVERED TO A INDUSTRIAL CONSUMER SITE, USING A THERMAL CONDUCTIVITY TECHNIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 07.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9013803 (IIT RES INST [US]) [A] 1 * page 33, lines 1-19 * * page 33, line 36 - page 34, line 10 * * page 36, lines 11-29 *; | [A]US2012191349 (LENZ ELMAR H [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0053] , [ 101] - [0106]; figure 8 *; | [A]WO2014142829 (BASCOM TURNER INSTR INC [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022]; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2014345363 (PRETRE PHILIPPE [CH], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0092] , [0 94] * * paragraphs [0101] , [ 102] * * paragraph [0132] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US2017276655 (LI SHU [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 19] , [0 24] * |