EP3740559 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CELL CULTURE SCALING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life Technologies Corporation 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAU, Christopher c/o Life Technologies Corporation Attn: IP Docketing 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | 02 /
JONES, Nephi c/o Life Technologies Corporation Attn: IP Docketing 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Mark c/o Life Technologies Corporation Attn: IP Docketing 5823 Newton Drive Carlsbad, California 92008 / US | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Thermo Fisher Scientific- Life Sciences Solutions Group Life Technologies Frankfurter Straße 129b 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2020/48] | Application number, filing date | 19701410.3 | 03.01.2019 | [2020/48] | WO2019US12120 | Priority number, date | US201862618215P | 17.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862618215 P | US201862670934P | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862670934 P | US201862712343P | 31.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862712343 P | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019143476 | Date: | 25.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3740559 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M1/06, C12M1/34 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
C12M23/58 (EP,US);
C12M35/04 (US);
B01F23/233 (US);
B01F27/054 (US);
B01F27/114 (US);
B01F27/213 (US);
B01F27/92 (US);
B01F35/3204 (US);
B01F35/4121 (US);
B01F35/43 (US);
B01F35/513 (US);
C12M23/50 (US);
C12M27/02 (EP,US);
C12M27/06 (US);
C12M41/48 (US);
C12N5/0602 (US);
B01F2035/352 (US);
B01F2101/44 (US);
B01F23/23362 (US);
B01F27/90 (US);
B01F35/3214 (US);
C12N2527/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SKALIERUNG EINER ZELLKULTUR | [2020/48] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CELL CULTURE SCALING | [2020/48] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE À L'ÉCHELLE DE CULTURE DE CELLULES | [2020/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 07.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010089151 (LONZA BIOLOGICS PLC [GB], et al); | [A]WO2012097079 (XCELLEREX INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2017023638 (STADLER ERNEST L [US]); | [A]US2017183617 (JONES NEPHI D [US], et al) | by applicant | US6083587 | US2002131654 | US2003077466 | US6655655 | US2006196501 | US2006240546 | US2006270036 | US2008032389 | US7384783 | US7682067 | US2011207218 | US2013082410 | US9388375 | US9643133 | US2017183617 |