Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3745904
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.07.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
15.07.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.07.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.05.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.05.2024 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
22.03.2024 |
Change - French title |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
12.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.04.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
05.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
13.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.11.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
12.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.07.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
15.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
05.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|