Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11331560 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2022 | B2 | US2020352290 | 12.11.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH1132018 | 01.02.2018 | WO2019EP51209 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20200116136 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CH1132018 | 01.02.2018 | WO2019EP51209 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7385578B | Global Dossier | 22.11.2023 | B2 | JP2021511883 | 13.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CH1132018 | 01.02.2018 | WO2019EP51209 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111669988B | Global Dossier | 17.02.2023 | B | CN111669988 | 15.09.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CH1132018 | 01.02.2018 | WO2019EP51209 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3745904 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2024 | B1 | EP3745904 | 09.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH1132018 | 01.02.2018 | WO2019EP51209 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2020127796 | 18.03.2022 | A3 | RU2020127796 | 01.03.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CH1132018 | 01.02.2018 | WO2019EP51209 | 18.01.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019149544 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CH1132018 | 01.02.2018 |