EP3743041 - NEW SPIRONOLACTONE FORMULATIONS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.10.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Resumption | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apidel SA 29, Quai du Mont Blanc 1201 Geneva / CH | For all designated states Inserm 101 rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states SORBONNE UNIVERSITE 21, rue de l'École de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Paris 85 boulevard Saint Germain 75006 Paris / FR | For all designated states ASSISTANCE PUBLIQUE, HOPITAUX DE PARIS 3, avenue Victoria 75004 Paris / FR | [2020/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GURNY, Robert 7 rue Calvin 1204 Geneva / CH | 02 /
BEHAR-COHEN, Francine 160 rue de Longchamp 75116 Paris / FR | 03 /
BOURGES, Jean Louis 90 rue de Rennes 75006 Paris / FR | [2020/49] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/49] | Helbig, Christian Wagner + Helbig Patentanwälte Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19701519.1 | 24.01.2019 | [2020/49] | WO2019EP51764 | Priority number, date | EP20180000064 | 26.01.2018 Original published format: EP 18000064 | [2020/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145430 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3743041 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/107, A61K31/585, A61K47/34 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A61K9/1075 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (US);
A61K31/585 (EP);
A61K47/34 (EP,US);
A61K9/0048 (EP);
A61P27/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE SPIRONOLACTON-FORMULIERUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2020/49] | English: | NEW SPIRONOLACTONE FORMULATIONS AND THEIR USE | [2020/49] | French: | NOUVELLES FORMULATIONS DE SPIRONOLACTONE ET LEUR UTILISATION | [2020/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/49] | 11.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 26.08.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2021/15] | 02.12.2024 | Resumption of proceedings | [2024/25] | 26.08.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2024/25] | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2007012979 (UNIV GENEVE [CH], et al) [AD] 1-15 * examples 1-4 *; | [AD]WO2012014011 (UNIV GENEVE [CH], et al) [AD] 1-15 * examples 1-8 * | [X] - N DAHMANA ET AL, "P-6 Targeted Nanocarrier-Mediated Ocular Delivery of Spironolactone to Improve Corneal Wound Healing: Demonstrating Tolerability and Efficacy In Vivo", SWISS PHARMA SCIENCE DAY 2017, (20170822), page 22, XP055573995 [X] 1-15 * Methods * | by applicant | WO2007012979 | WO2012014011 | US6469133 | US6126919 | - REMINGTON, Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mack Printing Company, (19900000), pages 1289 - 1329 | - S. WERNER; R. GROSE, "Regulation of wound healing by growth factors and cytokines", Physiol. Rev., (20030000), vol. 83, doi:doi:10.1152/physrev.00031.2002, pages 835 - 870, XP002672025 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physrev.00031.2002 | - V.T. NGUYEN; N. FARMAN; E. MAUBEC; D. NASSAR; D. DESPOSITO; L. WAECKEL; S. ARACTINGI; F. JAISSER, "Re-epithelialization of pathological cutaneous wounds is improved by local mineralocorticoid receptor antagonism", J. Invest. Dermatol., (20160000), vol. 136, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jid.2016.05.101, pages 2080 - 2089, XP055449950 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jid.2016.05.101 | - S.C. PARK; J.H. KIM, "Effect of steroids and nonsteroidal anti-inflammatory agents on stromal wound healing following excimer laser keratectomy in rabbits", Ophthalmic Surg. Lasers, (19960000), vol. 27, pages 481 - 486 | - M. SRINIVASAN; P. LALITHA; R. MAHALAKSHMI; N.V. PRAJNA; J. MASCARENHAS; J.D. CHIDAMBARAM; S. LEE; K.C. HONG; M. ZEGANS; D.V. GLIDD, "Corticosteroids for bacterial corneal ulcers", Br. J. Ophthalmol., (20090000), vol. 93, pages 198 - 202 | - S. ADAMS; R.S. VALCHANOVA; B. MUNZ, "RIP2: a novel player in the regulation of keratinocyte proliferation and cutaneous wound repair?", Exp. Cell Res., (20100000), vol. 316, doi:doi:10.1016/j.yexcr.2009.12.001, pages 728 - 736, XP026913368 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2009.12.001 | - M. LIU; K. SAEKI; T. MATSUNOBU; T. OKUNO; T. KOGA; Y. SUGIMOTO; C. YOKOYAMA; S. NAKAMIZO; K. KABASHIMA; S. NARUMIYA, "12-Hydroxyheptadecatrienoic acid promotes epidermal wound healing by accelerating keratinocyte migration via the BLT2 receptor", Journal Experimental Medicine, (20140000), vol. 211, pages 1063 - 1078 | - M. KADMIEL; A. JANOSHAZI; X. XU; J.A. CIDLOWSKI, "Glucocorticoid action in human corneal epithelial cells establishes roles for corticosteroids in wound healing and barrier function of the eye", Exp. Eye Res., (20160000), vol. 152, doi:doi:10.1016/j.exer.2016.08.020, pages 10 - 33, XP029799520 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2016.08.020 | - N. HASHIZUME; S. SAIKA; Y. OKADA; T. MIYAMOTO; K. SHIMIZU; Y. OHNISHI, "Effects of antiinflammatory drugs on migration of the rabbit corneal epithelium", J. Cataract Refract. Surg., (20010000), vol. 27, pages 1499 - 1502 | - E. MAUBEC; C. LAOUENAN; L. DESCHAMPS; V.T. NGUYEN; I. SCHEER-SENYARICH; A.C. WACKENHEIM-JACOBS; M. STEFF; S. DUHAMEL; S. TUBIANA;, "Topical mineralocorticoid receptor blockade limits glucocorticoid-induced epidermal atrophy in human skin", J. Invest. Dermatol., (20150000), vol. 135, doi:doi:10.1038/jid.2015.44, pages 1781 - 1789, XP055449985 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/jid.2015.44 | - A.A. SARCHAHI; A. MAIMANDI; A.K. TAFTI; M. AMANI, "Effects of acetylcysteine and dexamethasone on experimental corneal wounds in rabbits", Ophthalmic Res, (20080000), vol. 40, pages 41 - 48 | - C.S. DE PAIVA; R.M. CORRALES; A.L. VILLARREAL; W.J. FARLEY; D.Q. LI; M.E. STEM; S.C. PFLUGFELDER, "Corticosteroid and doxycycline suppress MMP-9 and inflammatory cytokine expression, MAPK activation in the corneal epithelium in experimental dry eye", Exp. Eye Res., (20060000), vol. 83, doi:doi:10.1016/j.exer.2006.02.004, pages 526 - 535, XP024945505 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2006.02.004 | - O. STOJADINOVIC; L.E. LINDLEY; I. JOZIC; M. TOMIC-CANIC, "Mineralocorticoid Receptor Antagonists-A New Sprinkle of Salt and Youth", J. Invest. Dermatol., (20160000), vol. 136, pages 1938 - 1941 | - G. PETROUTSOS; R. GUIMARAES; J.P. GIRAUD; Y. POULIQUEN, "Corticosteroids and corneal epithelial wound healing", Br. J. Ophthalmol., (19820000), vol. 66, pages 705 - 708 | - P. FAGERHOLM, "Wound healing after photorefractive keratectomy", J. Cataract Refract. Surg., (20000000), vol. 26, pages 432 - 447, XP027409684 | - A.S. WANG; E.J. ARMSTRONG; A.W. ARMSTRONG, "Corticosteroids and wound healing: clinical considerations in the perioperative period", Am. J. Surg., (20130000), vol. 206, doi:doi:10.1016/j.amjsurg.2012.11.018, pages 410 - 417, XP028693080 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjsurg.2012.11.018 | - J.K. YOUM; K. PARK; Y. UCHIDA; A. CHAN; T.M. MAURO; W.M. HOLLERAN; P.M. ELIAS, "Local blockade of glucocorticoid activation reverses stress- and glucocorticoid-induced delays in cutaneous wound healing", Wound Repair Regen, (20130000), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1111/wrr.12083, pages 715 - 722, XP055333712 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/wrr.12083 | - N. FARMAN; V.T. NGUYEN, "A novel actor in skin biology: the mineralocorticoid receptor", Exp. Dermatol., (20160000), vol. 25, pages 24 - 25 | - P. CORVOL; M. CLAIRE; M.E. OBLIN; K. GEERING; B. ROSSIER, "Mechanism of the antimineralocorticoid effects of spirolactones", Kidney Int, (19810000), vol. 20, pages 1 - 6 | - W. SUTANTO; E.R. DE KLOET, "Mineralocorticoid receptor ligands: biochemical, pharmacological, and clinical aspects", Med. Res. Rev., (19910000), vol. 11, pages 617 - 639 | - "Ocular Pharmacokinetics", D.M. MAURICE; S. MISHIMA, Pharmacology of the Eye, Springer Berlin Heidelberg, (19840000), pages 19 - 116 | - P.R. JENSEN; S.B. ARONSON; M. POLLYCOVE; E. YAMAMOTO, "Mechanisms of host response in the eye. 3. Interocular protein transfer", Arch. Ophthalmol., (19670000), vol. 77, pages 814 - 817 | - P. JENSEN; M. POLLYCOVE; S.B. ARONSO; E. YAMAMOTO, "Radioisotopic measurements of protein transfer between the eyes", Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (19640000), vol. 3, page 676 | - F. BEHAR-COHEN; J.M. PAREL; Y. POULIQUEN; B. THILLAYE-GOLDENBERG; O. GOUREAU; S. HEYDOLPH; Y. COURTOIS; Y. DE KOZAK, "Iontophoresis of dexamethasone in the treatment of endotoxin-induced-uveitis in rats", Exp. Eye Res., (19970000), vol. 65, doi:doi:10.1006/exer.1997.0364, pages 533 - 545, XP002932804 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exer.1997.0364 | - P.E. STOKES; P.M. STOLL; J.H. SCHLUGER; B. LASLEY, "Hypercortisolemia decreases dexamethasone half-life in rabbit", J. Psychiatr. Res., (20020000), vol. 36, pages 423 - 428 | - B.A. MARON; J.A. LEOPOLD, "Mineralocorticoid receptor antagonists and endothelial function", Curr Opin Investig Drugs, (20080000), vol. 9, pages 963 - 969 | - J. BEYER; A. BIERL; F.T. PETERS; H.H. MAURER, "Screening procedure for detection of diuretics and uricosurics and/or their metabolites in human urine using gas chromatography-mass spectrometry after extractive methylation", Ther. Drug Monit., (20050000), vol. 27, pages 509 - 520 | - M.E. RAFESTIN-OBLIN; M. LOMBES; B. COUETTE; E.E. BAULIEU, "Differences between aldosterone and its antagonists in binding kinetics and ligand-induced hsp90 release from mineralocorticosteroid receptor", J. Steroid Biochem. Mol. Biol., (19920000), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1016/0960-0760(92)90430-Q, pages 815 - 821, XP023550141 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-0760(92)90430-Q | - M.E. RAFESTIN-OBLIN; M. LOMBES; P. LUSTENBERGER; P. BLANCHARDIE; A. MICHAUD; G. CORNU; M. CLAIRE, "Affinity of corticosteroids for mineralocorticoid and glucocorticoid receptors of the rabbit kidney: effect of steroid substitution", J. Steroid Biochem., (19860000), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-4731(86)90398-5, pages 527 - 534, XP023417038 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-4731(86)90398-5 | - J. STOKES; J. NOBLE; L. BRETT; C. PHILLIPS; J.R. SECKL; C. O'BRIEN; R. ANDREW, "Distribution of glucocorticoid and mineralocorticoid receptors and 1 lbeta-hydroxysteroid dehydrogenases in human and rat ocular tissues", Invest. Ophthalmol. Vis. Sci., (20000000), vol. 41, pages 1629 - 1638 | - F. JAISSER; N. FARMAN, "Emerging Roles of the Mineralocorticoid Receptor in Pathology: Toward New Paradigms in Clinical Pharmacology", Pharmacol. Rev., (20160000), vol. 68, pages 49 - 75 | - H.Y. YANG; R.P. CHARLES; E. HUMMLER; D.L. BAINES; R.R. ISSEROFF, "The epithelial sodium channel mediates the directionality of galvanotaxis in human keratinocytes", J. Cell Sci., (20130000), vol. 126, pages 1942 - 1951 | - ZHAO M; RODRIGUEZ-VILLAGRA E; KOWALCZUK L; LE NORMAND M; BERDUGO M; LEVY-BOUKRIS R; EL ZAOUI I; KAUFMANN B; GURNY R; BRAVO-OSUNA I, "Tolerance of high and low amounts of PLGA microspheres loaded with mineralocorticoid receptor antagonist in retinal target site", Control Release, (20171128), vol. 266, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2017.09.029, pages 187 - 197, XP085292747 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2017.09.029 |