EP3737331 - APPARATUS FOR ALIGNING OR POSITIONING TEETH, AND PLURALITY OF ELEMEMTS FOR USE IN THE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/47] | APPARATUS FOR ALIGNING OR POSITIONING TEETH, AND RELATED METHODS | ||
[2024/26] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amundsen, Ole Christian Vølstadkroken 10 4025 Stavanger / NO | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 9 4068 Stavanger / NO | [N/P] |
Former [2020/47] | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 171 4301 Sandnes / NO | Application number, filing date | 19701740.3 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019NO50001 | Priority number, date | NO20180000057 | 12.01.2018 Original published format: NO 20180057 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019139487 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3737331 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61C7/14, A61C7/22, A61C7/28, A61C7/18, A61C5/00 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
A61C7/22 (EP,US);
A61C7/00 (NO);
A61C5/007 (EP);
A61C7/12 (NO);
A61C7/14 (EP,NO);
A61C7/146 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN ODER POSITIONIEREN VON ZÄHNEN UND MEHRERE ELEMENTE ZUR VERWENDUNG IN DER VORRICHTUNG | [2024/26] | English: | APPARATUS FOR ALIGNING OR POSITIONING TEETH, AND PLURALITY OF ELEMEMTS FOR USE IN THE APPARATUS | [2024/26] | French: | APPAREIL POUR ALIGNER OU POSITIONNER DES DENTS, ET PLUSIEURS ÉLÉMENTS À UTILISER DANS L'APPAREIL | [2024/26] |
Former [2020/47] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSRICHTEN ODER POSITIONIEREN VON ZÄHNEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2020/47] | APPARATUS FOR ALIGNING OR POSITIONING TEETH, AND RELATED METHODS | ||
Former [2020/47] | APPAREIL POUR ALIGNER OU POSITIONNER LES DENTS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 22.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2008013365 (KIM JAE SUNG [KR]); | [A]CN204562426U (GUANGZHOU RITON BIOMATERIAL CO LTD) |