EP3738301 - CAMERA WITH FOLDED OPTICS HAVING MOVEABLE LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2020/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Scott W. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
MIREAULT, Alfred N. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Brad V. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 04 /
SMYTH, Nicholas D. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 05 /
ADRIANO, Rummel R. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 06 /
SHARMA, Shashank One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 07 /
WEBSTER, Steven One Apple Park Way Cupertino, California 95014 / US | [2020/47] | Representative(s) | Wardle, Callum Tarn Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [2023/26] |
Former [2020/47] | Wardle, Callum Tarn Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19701948.2 | 10.01.2019 | [2020/47] | WO2019US13089 | Priority number, date | US201862615824P | 10.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862615824 P | US201916244030 | 09.01.2019 Original published format: US201916244030 | [2020/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019140115 | Date: | 18.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3738301 | Date: | 18.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3738301 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.07.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/54, G03B3/10, G03B5/02, G03B5/04, H04M1/02, G03B3/06, G03B5/00, G03B17/17, H02K41/035, H04N23/55, H04N23/57, H04N23/67, H04N23/68 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G03B3/10 (EP,US);
G03B5/04 (CN,KR,US);
H04N23/54 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G02B7/021 (CN);
G02B7/09 (CN);
G02B7/1805 (CN);
G03B13/36 (CN,KR,US);
G03B17/17 (EP,KR,US);
G03B3/06 (EP);
G03B30/00 (CN);
G03B5/00 (EP,US);
G03B5/02 (CN);
H02K41/0356 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04M1/026 (KR);
H04M1/0264 (EP,CN,US);
H04N23/55 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/67 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04N23/686 (KR);
H04N23/687 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03B2205/0007 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/35] | H04N5/225, G03B3/10, G03B5/02, G03B5/04, H04N5/232, H04M1/02, G03B3/06, G03B5/00, G03B17/17, H02K41/035 | ||
Former IPC [2020/47] | H04N5/225, G03B3/10, G03B5/02, G03B5/04, H04N5/232, H04M1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAMERA MIT GEFALTETER OPTIK MIT BEWEGLICHER LINSE | [2020/47] | English: | CAMERA WITH FOLDED OPTICS HAVING MOVEABLE LENS | [2020/47] | French: | CAMÉRA À OPTIQUE PLIÉE COMPORTANT UNE LENTILLE MOBILE | [2020/47] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/47] | 05.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23151922.4 / EP4184241 | Opposition(s) | 02.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.06.2023 | CZ | 28.06.2023 | DK | 28.06.2023 | EE | 28.06.2023 | ES | 28.06.2023 | FI | 28.06.2023 | HR | 28.06.2023 | IT | 28.06.2023 | LT | 28.06.2023 | LV | 28.06.2023 | MC | 28.06.2023 | NL | 28.06.2023 | PL | 28.06.2023 | RO | 28.06.2023 | RS | 28.06.2023 | SE | 28.06.2023 | SI | 28.06.2023 | SK | 28.06.2023 | SM | 28.06.2023 | NO | 28.09.2023 | GR | 29.09.2023 | IS | 28.10.2023 | PT | 30.10.2023 | LU | 10.01.2024 | [2024/43] |
Former [2024/40] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
MC | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SI | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SI | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
IT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
DK | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
EE | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
PL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RO | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
PT | 30.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 28.06.2023 | |
CZ | 28.06.2023 | ||
ES | 28.06.2023 | ||
FI | 28.06.2023 | ||
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
IS | 28.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
SK | 28.06.2023 | ||
SM | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 28.06.2023 | |
HR | 28.06.2023 | ||
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
LT | 28.06.2023 | ||
LV | 28.06.2023 | ||
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
NL | 28.06.2023 | ||
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 28.06.2023 | |
RS | 28.06.2023 | ||
SE | 28.06.2023 | ||
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | ||
GR | 29.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 28.06.2023 | |
NO | 28.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012249815 (BOHN DAVID D [US], et al); | [A]US2013201559 (MINAMISAWA SHINJI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015103417 (NOMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2015286033 (OSBORNE THOMAS WESLEY [US]); | [A]US2016044247 (SHABTAY GAL [IL], et al); | [XAI]WO2016207754 (COREPHOTONICS LTD [IL]) |