EP3746929 - SECURING HEADLESS DEVICES FROM MALICIOUS (RE-)CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEES, Walter High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BROUWER, Ton High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
VAN DE LAAR, Franciscus Antonius Maria High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 19702061.3 | 25.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019EP51812 | Priority number, date | US201862622984P | 29.01.2018 Original published format: US 201862622984 P | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019145456 | Date: | 01.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3746929 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/62, G06F21/43, H04L29/06, H04W12/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
G06F21/43 (EP,US);
H04W12/50 (EP,US);
G06F21/6245 (EP,US);
H04L63/18 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | SICHERUNG VON KOPFLOSEN VORRICHTUNGEN VOR BÖSWILLIGER (NEU-)KONFIGURATION | [2020/50] | English: | SECURING HEADLESS DEVICES FROM MALICIOUS (RE-)CONFIGURATION | [2020/50] | French: | SÉCURISATION DE DISPOSITIFS SANS TÊTE CONTRE UNE (RE-)CONFIGURATION MALVEILLANTE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 31.08.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2717632 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0054] * * figure 4 ** claims 1,4 *; | [I]US2017289800 (FRUSINA CRISTIAN [CA]) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0102] - [0141] * * figures 1A-1E *; | [A]US2017372600 (PALIN ARTO [FI], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0270] - [0290] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | US19840626229 |