EP3749623 - PROCESS FOR MODIFICATION OF A SOLID SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CZ, RO, SK | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Surfix B.V. P.O.Box 286 6700 AG Wageningen / NL | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIJO DA COSTA CARVALHO, Rui Pedro P.O. Box 286 6700 AG Wageningen / NL | 02 /
SCHUTZ-TRILLING, Anke Kristin P.O. Box 286 6700 AG Wageningen / NL | 03 /
VAN DER MEER, Adriaan Martin Hubert Henri P.O. Box 286 6700 AG Wageningen / NL | 04 /
ZUILHOF, Johannes Teunis P.O. Box 286 6700 AG Wageningen / NL | 05 /
KNOBEN, Wout P.O. Box 286 6700 AG Wageningen / NL | 06 /
SCHERES, Luc Maria Wilhelmus P.O. Box 286 6700 AG Wageningen / NL | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | IPecunia P.O. Box 593 6160 AN Geleen / NL | [2023/28] |
Former [2020/51] | Renkema, Jaap IPecunia Patents B.V. P.O. Box 593 6160 AN Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 19702645.3 | 08.02.2019 | [2020/51] | WO2019EP53115 | Priority number, date | EP20180155697 | 08.02.2018 Original published format: EP 18155697 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019154978 | Date: | 15.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749623 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3749623 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/30, C03C23/00, C09D1/00, C09D4/00, C08J7/04, C03C17/28 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
C03C17/30 (EP,KR,US);
C08J7/18 (KR);
C03C17/28 (EP,KR);
C03C23/00 (EP,KR);
C08F220/24 (KR);
C08J7/04 (KR);
C08J7/0427 (US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/056 (EP,US);
C09D1/00 (EP,KR);
C09D4/00 (EP,KR,US);
C09D5/1606 (EP,KR);
C09D7/63 (EP,US);
C09D7/66 (EP);
C09D7/67 (US);
| C-Set: |
C09D4/00, C08F220/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG EINER FESTEN OBERFLÄCHE | [2020/51] | English: | PROCESS FOR MODIFICATION OF A SOLID SURFACE | [2020/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION D'UNE SURFACE SOLIDE | [2023/10] |
Former [2020/51] | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA MODIFICATION D'UNE SURFACE SOLIDE | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/51] | 07.09.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.07.2023 | ES | 12.07.2023 | HR | 12.07.2023 | PL | 12.07.2023 | RO | 12.07.2023 | RS | 12.07.2023 | SK | 12.07.2023 | SM | 12.07.2023 | NO | 12.10.2023 | GR | 13.10.2023 | IS | 12.11.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
SM | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
HR | 12.07.2023 | ||
PL | 12.07.2023 | ||
RS | 12.07.2023 | ||
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | ES | 12.07.2023 | |
NO | 12.10.2023 | ||
GR | 13.10.2023 | ||
IS | 12.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 12.10.2023 | |
GR | 13.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03078159 (UNIV MINNESOTA [US], et al) [A] 14-16* figures 1,3,5,6; example - *; | [I]WO2009079647 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 14-16 * paragraph [0086]; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP3207992 (MICRONIT MICROFLUIDICS BV [NL]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 64]; figure 4; example -; claims 1, 3, 6 *; | [A] - ROY HELMY ET AL, "Reaction of Organosilicon Hydrides with Solid Surfaces: An Example of Surface-Catalyzed Self-Assembly", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20040528), vol. 126, no. 24, doi:10.1021/ja0498336, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 7595 - 7600, XP055483709 [A] 1-13 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0498336 | Examination | - Rui Rijo Carvalho ET AL, "Local Light-Induced Modification of the Inside of Microfluidic Glass Chips", Langmuir, US, (20160315), vol. 32, no. 10, doi:10.1021/acs.langmuir.5b04621, ISSN 0743-7463, pages 2389 - 2398, XP055326023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.langmuir.5b04621 | by applicant | US5429708 | US6331329 | US6524655 | US6673459 | US8221879 | US8481435 | US8993479 | WO2015136913 | - R. RIJO CARVALHO; S. P. PUJARI; S. C. LANGE; R. SEN; E. X. VROUWE; H. ZUILHOF, "Local Light-Induced Modification of the Inside of Microfluidic Glass Chips", Langmuir, (20160000), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1021/acs.langmuir.5b04621, pages 2389 - 2398, XP055326023 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.langmuir.5b04621 | - R. HELMY; R.W. WENSLOW; A.Y. FADEEV, "Reaction of Organosilicon Hydrides with Solid Surfaces: An example of Surface-Catalyzed Self-Assembly", J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20040000), vol. 126, doi:doi:10.1021/ja0498336, pages 7595 - 7600, XP055483709 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0498336 | - Macromolecules, (20170000), vol. 50, pages 7448 - 7457 | - Macromolecules, (20080000), vol. 41, pages 2003 - 2010 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20040000), vol. 126, pages 7595 - 7600 | - Langmuir, (20130000), vol. 29, pages 4019 - 4031 | WO2017EP69608 |