14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
19.05.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.06.2023 [2023/25] |
24.03.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.04.2023 [2023/17] |
17.02.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.03.2023 [2023/12] |
03.02.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
27.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2023 [2023/09] |
13.01.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
18.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] |
11.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] |
04.11.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
28.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
21.10.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] |
30.09.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
11.03.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.04.2022 [2022/15] |
04.03.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.03.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.01.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
03.04.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] |
19.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
15.01.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
06.11.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
06.11.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
12.10.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.07.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
20.07.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.06.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
03.03.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
23.08.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
10.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.08.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
14.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|