Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11114230 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | B2 | US2020411217 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102338894B | Global Dossier | 13.12.2021 | B1 | KR20200128670 | 16.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7277471B | Global Dossier | 19.05.2023 | B2 | JP2021511678 | 06.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111801809 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3089806 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019214502B | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | B2 | AU2019214502 | 13.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3747060 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2022 | B1 | EP3747060 | 09.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201801476D0 | 14.03.2018 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201812120D0 | 05.09.2018 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2745295 | 23.03.2021 | C1 | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | WO2019GB50241 | 30.01.2019 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019150091 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201812120 | 25.07.2018 | GB201801476 | 30.01.2018 |