EP3747060 - MONITORING DEVICE FOR CRYOGENIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.08.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokamak Energy Ltd 173 Brook Drive Milton Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4SD / GB | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRITTLES, Greg c/o Tokamak Energy Ltd Culham Innovation Centre D5 Culham Science Centre Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | 02 /
SLADE, Robert c/o Tokamak Energy Ltd Culham Innovation Centre D5 Culham Science Centre Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 4SD / GB | 03 /
KRUIP, Marcel c/o Tokamak Energy Ltd Culham Innovation Centre D5 Culham Science Centre Milton Park Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 3DB / GB | 04 /
VAN NUGTEREN, Bas 29 Marina Way Abingdon, Oxfordshire OX14 5TN / GB | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Watkin, Timothy Lawrence Harvey Marks & Clerk LLP Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park Heatley Road Oxford OX4 4GE / GB | Application number, filing date | 19702701.4 | 30.01.2019 | [2020/50] | WO2019GB50241 | Priority number, date | GB20180001476 | 30.01.2018 Original published format: GB 201801476 | GB20180012120 | 25.07.2018 Original published format: GB 201812120 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019150091 | Date: | 08.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747060 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3747060 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/16, H02H7/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H10N60/30 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H01F6/02 (US);
G01R15/202 (KR);
G01R19/0092 (KR);
G01R19/12 (KR);
G01R33/3815 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN KRYOGENES SYSTEM | [2020/50] | English: | MONITORING DEVICE FOR CRYOGENIC SYSTEM | [2020/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE POUR SYSTÈME CRYOGÉNIQUE | [2020/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 20.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.04.2022 | AT | 13.04.2022 | CZ | 13.04.2022 | DK | 13.04.2022 | EE | 13.04.2022 | ES | 13.04.2022 | FI | 13.04.2022 | HR | 13.04.2022 | LT | 13.04.2022 | LV | 13.04.2022 | MC | 13.04.2022 | NL | 13.04.2022 | PL | 13.04.2022 | RO | 13.04.2022 | RS | 13.04.2022 | SE | 13.04.2022 | SI | 13.04.2022 | SK | 13.04.2022 | SM | 13.04.2022 | BG | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.07.2022 | GR | 14.07.2022 | IS | 13.08.2022 | PT | 16.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SI | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 13.04.2022 | |
AT | 13.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
CZ | 13.04.2022 | ||
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
EE | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RO | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
SK | 13.04.2022 | ||
SM | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
DK | 13.04.2022 | ||
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
IS | 13.08.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
PL | 13.04.2022 | ||
RS | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
HR | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
LV | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
BG | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
GR | 14.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 13.04.2022 | |
ES | 13.04.2022 | ||
FI | 13.04.2022 | ||
LT | 13.04.2022 | ||
NL | 13.04.2022 | ||
SE | 13.04.2022 | ||
NO | 13.07.2022 | ||
PT | 16.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 13.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS6452331 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JP2006332559 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AD]WO2017042541 (TOKAMAK ENERGY LTD [GB]) | Examination | EP1876609 |